Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Environment - Personal Care Products Containing Synthetic Plastic Microbeads - Prohibition on Manufacturing or Sale
Sponsored by
Delegates Morhaim, Carr, Chang, Ebersole, Fraser-Hidalgo, Frush, Krimm, Lafferty, Lam, McComas, K. Young, Angel, Hettleman, Hill, C. Howard, Luedtke, Platt, and Smith
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 409
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Prohibiting a person from manufacturing for sale or accepting for sale a personal care product or an over-the-counter drug that contains synthetic plastic microbeads on or after specified dates; requiring the Department of the Environment to adopt specified regulations; requiring the Department to periodically review specified guidelines to ensure that specified methods are being utilized to prevent the entrance of synthetic plastic microbeads into the natural aquatic environment of the State; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0200
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2015
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/30/2015
Legislative Date
2/02/2015
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/04/2015
Legislative Date
2/04/2015
Action
Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2015
Legislative Date
3/20/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2015
Legislative Date
3/18/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments {940316/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
48
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2015
Legislative Date
3/18/2015
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
48
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2015
Legislative Date
3/19/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed (127-10)
Proceedings
49
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/23/2015
Legislative Date
3/20/2015
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
47A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2015
Legislative Date
4/06/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2015
Legislative Date
3/30/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments {134232/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
57
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2015
Legislative Date
3/30/2015
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
57
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2015
Legislative Date
3/31/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed with Amendments (46-0)
Proceedings
58
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2015
Legislative Date
4/06/2015
Action
House Refuses to Concur - Senate Amendments
Proceedings
67
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2015
Legislative Date
4/06/2015
Action
House Requests Senate Recede
Proceedings
67
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2015
Legislative Date
4/06/2015
Action
Conference Committee Appointed
Proceedings
67
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2015
Legislative Date
4/06/2015
Action
Delegates Barve, Frush, and O'Donnell
Proceedings
67
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/13/2015
Legislative Date
4/05/2015
Action
Senate Refuses to Recede
Proceedings
63
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/13/2015
Legislative Date
4/05/2015
Action
Conference Committee Appointed
Proceedings
63
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/13/2015
Legislative Date
4/05/2015
Action
Senators Pinsky, Montgomery, and Bates
Proceedings
63
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/13/2015
Legislative Date
4/08/2015
Action
Conference Committee Report Adopted
Proceedings
69
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/13/2015
Legislative Date
4/08/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed (135-3)
Proceedings
69
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/13/2015
Legislative Date
4/07/2015
Action
Conference Committee Report Adopted
Proceedings
65
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/13/2015
Legislative Date
4/07/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
65
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/13/2015
Legislative Date
4/08/2015
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
65
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/12/2015
Legislative Date
5/12/2015
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 409
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/30/2015 2/02/2015 First Reading Environment and Transportation
House 2/04/2015 2/04/2015 Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/19/2015 3/20/2015 Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
House 3/20/2015 3/18/2015 Favorable with Amendments {940316/1 Report Adopted 48
House 3/20/2015 3/18/2015 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 48
House 3/20/2015 3/19/2015 Third Reading Passed (127-10) 49
Senate 3/23/2015 3/20/2015 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 47A
Senate 4/06/2015 4/06/2015 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 4/06/2015 3/30/2015 Favorable with Amendments {134232/1 Report Adopted 57
Senate 4/06/2015 3/30/2015 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 57
Senate 4/07/2015 3/31/2015 Third Reading Passed with Amendments (46-0) 58
House 4/11/2015 4/06/2015 House Refuses to Concur - Senate Amendments 67
House 4/11/2015 4/06/2015 House Requests Senate Recede 67
House 4/11/2015 4/06/2015 Conference Committee Appointed 67
House 4/11/2015 4/06/2015 Delegates Barve, Frush, and O'Donnell 67
Senate 4/13/2015 4/05/2015 Senate Refuses to Recede 63
Senate 4/13/2015 4/05/2015 Conference Committee Appointed 63
Senate 4/13/2015 4/05/2015 Senators Pinsky, Montgomery, and Bates 63
House 4/13/2015 4/08/2015 Conference Committee Report Adopted 69
House 4/13/2015 4/08/2015 Third Reading Passed (135-3) 69
Senate 4/13/2015 4/07/2015 Conference Committee Report Adopted 65
Senate 4/13/2015 4/07/2015 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 65
House 4/13/2015 4/08/2015 Passed Enrolled 65
Post Passage 5/12/2015 5/12/2015 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 409
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   9-2001 through 9-2003 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM