Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Income Tax Credit - Class F Vehicles - Extension
Sponsored by
Delegate Ebersole
Status
In the House - Hearing 2/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Extending, from January 1,2020, to January 1, 2023, the taxable years for which individuals or corporations may claim a State income tax credit for the expense of registering certain qualified vehicles in the State.
Committees
Original:
Ways and Means  
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0144
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2020
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/16/2020
Legislative Date
1/16/2020
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Income Tax Credit - Class F Vehicles - Extension
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/21/2020
Legislative Date
1/21/2020
Action
Hearing 2/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/16/2020 1/16/2020 First Reading Ways and Means
Text - First - Income Tax Credit - Class F Vehicles - Extension
House 1/21/2020 1/21/2020 Hearing 2/04 at 1:00 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   10-734.1 )
Last Updated: 9/22/2020 1:40 PM