Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Procurement - Small Businesses and Minority Businesses - Qualification and Certification
Sponsored by
Delegates J. Lewis, Barron, Angel, Chang, Hayes, Jones, Sanchez, Sydnor, A. Washington, and P. Young
Status
In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring the Secretary of General Services, the Secretary of Transportation, the Chancellor of the University System of Maryland, and the President of Morgan State University to adopt regulations to require the qualification of a business as a small business if it has obtained a certain federal certification; requiring the Board of Public Works to adopt regulations providing for the certification of a business as a minority business enterprise if it has obtained a certain federal certification and meets certain requirements; etc.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2018
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/18/2018
Legislative Date
1/18/2018
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/24/2018
Legislative Date
1/24/2018
Action
Hearing 1/31 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/26/2018
Legislative Date
1/26/2018
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/26/2018
Legislative Date
1/26/2018
Action
Hearing 1/31 at 2:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/27/2018
Legislative Date
2/27/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/28/2018
Legislative Date
2/28/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {586588/1 Adopted
Proceedings
36
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/28/2018
Legislative Date
2/28/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
36
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/02/2018
Legislative Date
3/02/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (138-0)
Proceedings
38
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/05/2018
Legislative Date
3/05/2018
Action
Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
39
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2018
Legislative Date
3/15/2018
Action
Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2018
Legislative Date
4/05/2018
Action
Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/18/2018 1/18/2018 First Reading Health and Government Operations
Text - First - Procurement - Small Businesses and Minority Businesses - Qualification and Certification
House 1/24/2018 1/24/2018 Hearing 1/31 at 1:00 p.m.
House 1/26/2018 1/26/2018 Hearing canceled
House 1/26/2018 1/26/2018 Hearing 1/31 at 2:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
House 2/27/2018 2/27/2018 Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
House 2/28/2018 2/28/2018 Favorable with Amendments {586588/1 Adopted 36
House 2/28/2018 2/28/2018 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 36
Text - Third - Procurement - Small Businesses and Minority Businesses - Qualification and Certification
House 3/02/2018 3/02/2018 Third Reading Passed (138-0) 38
Senate 3/05/2018 3/05/2018 Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 39
Senate 3/15/2018 3/15/2018 Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 4/05/2018 4/05/2018 Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM