Bill Search
Bill number does not exist.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
To Governor
Title
Maryland Health Progress Act of 2013
Sponsored by
The Speaker (By Request - Administration) and Delegates Anderson, Barve, Bobo, Carr, Carter, Cullison, Davis, Donoghue, Feldman, Glenn, Griffith, Hammen, Hubbard, Hucker, A. Kelly, Lee, McIntosh, Mizeur, Morhaim, Murphy, Nathan-Pulliam, Pena-Melnyk, Pendergrass, Reznik, V. Turner, Vallario, and M. Washington
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 159
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Altering eligibility requirements for the Maryland Medical Assistance Program and the definition of "former foster care adolescent" to conform to federal eligibility requirements; authorizing the Secretary of Health and Mental Hygiene to provide specified grants; adding to the purposes for which a specified assessment in hospital rates may be used; exempting the Maryland Health Benefit Exchange and its employees from specified provisions of law governing third party administrators; etc.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0274
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2013, January 1, 2014, January 1, 2015
By Request of the Governor
History
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/21/2013 1/21/2013 First Reading Health and Government Operations
House 1/30/2013 1/30/2013 Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/21/2013 3/23/2013 Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
House 3/23/2013 3/20/2013 Favorable with Amendments {776480/1 53A
House 3/23/2013 3/20/2013 Floor Committee Amendment {976886/1 Adopted 53A
House 3/23/2013 3/20/2013 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 53A
House 3/25/2013 3/21/2013 Third Reading Passed (93-43) 54
Senate 3/25/2013 3/21/2013 First Reading Finance and Budget and Taxation 52
Senate 3/26/2013 3/26/2013 Hearing 4/02 at 1:00 p.m. (Finance)
Senate 4/03/2013 4/04/2013 Favorable Report by Finance
Senate 4/04/2013 3/30/2013 Favorable Report Adopted 61
Senate 4/04/2013 3/30/2013 Second Reading Passed 61
Senate 4/04/2013 3/30/2013 Motion two readings same day Const/Rule 24 (Senator Middleton) Adopted (47-0) 61
Senate 4/04/2013 3/30/2013 Third Reading Passed (36-11) 61
House 4/04/2013 3/30/2013 Returned Passed 63
Post Passage 5/02/2013 5/02/2013 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 159
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   15-101, 15-103, 19-143, 19-214 )
(   14-502, 14-504, 15-1303, 15-140, 27-405, 31-101, 31-103, 31-106, 31-107, 31-107.1, 31-107.2, 31-108, 31-111, 31-112, 31-113, 31-113.1, 31-114, 31-115, 31-116, 31-117, 31-119, 6-101, 6-103.2, 8-301 )
Last Updated: 11/6/2019 4:12 PM