Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Regional Greenhouse Gas Initiative - Withdrawal - Legislative Approval Required (Regional Greenhouse Gas Initiative Extension Act)
Sponsored by
Delegates Korman, Barkley, Barve, Brooks, Chang, Clippinger, Dumais, Fennell, Flanagan, Fraser-Hidalgo, Frick, Gilchrist, Glenn, Gutierrez, Healey, Hettleman, Hill, Jones, Kaiser, Kramer, Krimm, J. Lewis, R. Lewis, Lierman, Luedtke, McIntosh, A. Miller, Moon, Morhaim, Pena-Melnyk, Pendergrass, Platt, Reznik, Robinson, Rosenberg, Stein, Tarlau, Turner, Valderrama, Waldstreicher, and K. Young
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 768
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering the circumstances under which the State may withdraw from the Regional Greenhouse Gas Initiative by requiring the General Assembly to enact a law approving the withdrawal.
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0290
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2018
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/18/2018
Legislative Date
1/18/2018
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/24/2018
Legislative Date
1/24/2018
Action
Hearing 2/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/06/2018
Legislative Date
2/06/2018
Action
Favorable Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/07/2018
Legislative Date
2/07/2018
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
21
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/09/2018
Legislative Date
2/09/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (87-48)
Proceedings
23
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/12/2018
Legislative Date
2/12/2018
Action
Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
24
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/29/2018
Legislative Date
3/29/2018
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/29/2018
Legislative Date
3/26/2018
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
57
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/29/2018
Legislative Date
3/26/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
57
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/30/2018
Legislative Date
3/27/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (41-5)
Proceedings
58
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/02/2018
Legislative Date
3/24/2018
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
58
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/15/2018
Legislative Date
5/15/2018
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 768
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/18/2018 1/18/2018 First Reading Economic Matters
Text - First - Regional Greenhouse Gas Initiative - Withdrawal - Legislative Approval Required (Regional Greenhouse Gas Initiative Extension Act)
House 1/24/2018 1/24/2018 Hearing 2/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
House 2/06/2018 2/06/2018 Favorable Report by Economic Matters
House 2/07/2018 2/07/2018 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 21
Text - Third - Regional Greenhouse Gas Initiative - Withdrawal - Legislative Approval Required (Regional Greenhouse Gas Initiative Extension Act)
House 2/09/2018 2/09/2018 Third Reading Passed (87-48) 23
Senate 2/12/2018 2/12/2018 Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 24
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/29/2018 3/29/2018 Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/29/2018 3/26/2018 Favorable Adopted 57
Senate 3/29/2018 3/26/2018 Second Reading Passed 57
Senate 3/30/2018 3/27/2018 Third Reading Passed (41-5) 58
House 4/02/2018 3/24/2018 Returned Passed 58
Post Passage 5/15/2018 5/15/2018 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 768
Text - Chapter - Regional Greenhouse Gas Initiative - Withdrawal - Legislative Approval Required (Regional Greenhouse Gas Initiative Extension Act)
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   2-1002 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM