Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Land Use Actions - Legislative Bodies - Judicial Review
Sponsored by
Delegates Lafferty, B. Barnes, Beidle, Carr, Frush, Gilchrist, Korman, Lam, Lierman, Luedtke, and S. Robinson
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing a specified person who has been aggrieved by a land use decision, who is a taxpayer, or is an officer or unit of a local jurisdiction to file a request for judicial review by a circuit court of a land use action of a legislative body; specifying persons that have standing to bring and maintain a specified action in a circuit court to allow judicial review of a land use action of a legislative body; and applying a provision of law to a charter county and to Baltimore City.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0166
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/25/2016
Legislative Date
1/25/2016
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/27/2016
Legislative Date
1/27/2016
Action
Hearing 2/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2016
Legislative Date
3/16/2016
Action
Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/25/2016 1/25/2016 First Reading Environment and Transportation
House 1/27/2016 1/27/2016 Hearing 2/09 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/15/2016 3/16/2016 Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   10-103, 1-401, 4-406 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM