Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

HB0247


CH0130

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Orphans' Courts - Appeals - Procedures
Sponsored by
Delegate Malone
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 130
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring a certain appeal from a final judgment of an orphans' court to be made by filing a certain notice, rather than a certain order; extending from 30 days to 60 days the standard period of time within which the register of wills must transmit all pleadings and orders of the proceedings to the court to which the appeal is taken; applying the Act prospectively; etc.
Committees
Original:
Judiciary  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0149
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2020
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/17/2020
Legislative Date
1/17/2020
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/17/2020
Legislative Date
1/17/2020
Action
Hearing 2/05 at 2:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Orphans' Courts - Appeals - Procedures
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/24/2020
Legislative Date
2/24/2020
Action
Favorable Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/25/2020
Legislative Date
2/25/2020
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
35
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Orphans' Courts - Appeals - Procedures
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/27/2020
Legislative Date
2/27/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (137-0)
Proceedings
37
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/28/2020
Legislative Date
2/28/2020
Action
Referred Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
38
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2020
Legislative Date
3/14/2020
Action
Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2020
Legislative Date
3/09/2020
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
48
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2020
Legislative Date
3/10/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
49
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2020
Legislative Date
3/12/2020
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
49A
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/08/2020
Legislative Date
5/08/2020
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 130
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/17/2020 1/17/2020 First Reading Judiciary
House 1/17/2020 1/17/2020 Hearing 2/05 at 2:00 p.m.
Text - First - Orphans' Courts - Appeals - Procedures
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
House 2/24/2020 2/24/2020 Favorable Report by Judiciary
House 2/25/2020 2/25/2020 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 35
Text - Third - Orphans' Courts - Appeals - Procedures
House 2/27/2020 2/27/2020 Third Reading Passed (137-0) 37
Senate 2/28/2020 2/28/2020 Referred Judicial Proceedings 38
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/14/2020 3/14/2020 Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/14/2020 3/09/2020 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 48
Senate 3/15/2020 3/10/2020 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 49
House 3/16/2020 3/12/2020 Returned Passed 49A
Post Passage 5/08/2020 5/08/2020 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 130
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 5/11/2020 4:11 PM