Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Washington County - Amusement Devices - Tip Jars
Sponsored by
Washington County Delegation
Status
In the House - Conference Committee Appointed
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Altering the definition of "amusement device" as it relates to the operation and regulation of amusement devices in Washington County to include a game activated by an object or another consideration of value; and altering the definition of "gross profits" as it relates to the operation of tip jars in Washington County to require the deduction of the cost of a gaming sticker.
Committees
Original:
Ways and Means  
Opposite:
Budget and Taxation  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0535
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0461 Session: 2012 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2013
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/22/2013
Legislative Date
1/23/2013
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/23/2013
Legislative Date
1/23/2013
Action
Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/19/2013
Legislative Date
2/20/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/21/2013
Legislative Date
2/21/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments {925260/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
32
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/21/2013
Legislative Date
2/21/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
32
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/26/2013
Legislative Date
2/26/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed (131-1)
Proceedings
35
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/27/2013
Legislative Date
2/27/2013
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
34B
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/06/2013
Legislative Date
3/06/2013
Action
Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/11/2013
Legislative Date
3/11/2013
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/11/2013
Legislative Date
3/11/2013
Action
Hearing 3/20 at 2:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2013
Legislative Date
3/19/2013
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2013
Legislative Date
3/19/2013
Action
Hearing 3/20 at 1:15 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2013
Legislative Date
4/03/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2013
Legislative Date
3/29/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments {589535/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
60
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2013
Legislative Date
3/29/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
60
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2013
Legislative Date
3/30/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed with Amendments (47-0)
Proceedings
61
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2013
Legislative Date
4/02/2013
Action
House Refuses to Concur - Senate Amendments
Proceedings
66
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2013
Legislative Date
4/02/2013
Action
House Requests Senate Recede
Proceedings
66
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2013
Legislative Date
4/02/2013
Action
Conference Committee Appointed
Proceedings
66
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2013
Legislative Date
4/02/2013
Action
Delegates Luedtke, Serafini, and Walker
Proceedings
66
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/22/2013 1/23/2013 First Reading Ways and Means
House 1/23/2013 1/23/2013 Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/19/2013 2/20/2013 Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
House 2/21/2013 2/21/2013 Favorable with Amendments {925260/1 Report Adopted 32
House 2/21/2013 2/21/2013 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 32
House 2/26/2013 2/26/2013 Third Reading Passed (131-1) 35
Senate 2/27/2013 2/27/2013 First Reading Budget and Taxation 34B
Senate 3/06/2013 3/06/2013 Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/11/2013 3/11/2013 Hearing cancelled
Senate 3/11/2013 3/11/2013 Hearing 3/20 at 2:00 p.m.
Senate 3/19/2013 3/19/2013 Hearing cancelled
Senate 3/19/2013 3/19/2013 Hearing 3/20 at 1:15 p.m.
Senate 4/02/2013 4/03/2013 Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 4/03/2013 3/29/2013 Favorable with Amendments {589535/1 Report Adopted 60
Senate 4/03/2013 3/29/2013 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 60
Senate 4/04/2013 3/30/2013 Third Reading Passed with Amendments (47-0) 61
House 4/08/2013 4/02/2013 House Refuses to Concur - Senate Amendments 66
House 4/08/2013 4/02/2013 House Requests Senate Recede 66
House 4/08/2013 4/02/2013 Conference Committee Appointed 66
House 4/08/2013 4/02/2013 Delegates Luedtke, Serafini, and Walker 66
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   17-441, 17-442 )
(   13-2435 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM