Bill Search
Bill number does not exist.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
To Governor
Title
Health Insurance - Individual Market Stabilization - Provider Fee
Sponsored by
Delegates Pena-Melnyk, Pendergrass, Barron, Charles, Cullison, Kelly, R. Lewis, Rosenberg, Sample-Hughes, and K. Young
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 597
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Clarifying that certain provisions of law apply to managed care organizations; requiring a managed care organization to pay a certain fee in certain calendar years; altering the purpose of provisions of law requiring that certain entities be subject to a certain assessment on certain amounts; requiring that certain entities be subject to certain assessments in certain calendar years; clarifying that certain assessments are for insurance products subject to certain provisions of federal law and may be subject to a State assessment; etc.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0239
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2019
Contingency - on a contingency described in Sec. 3 of the bill
Creates a Task Force or Commission
History
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/25/2019 1/25/2019 First Reading Health and Government Operations
Text - First - Health Insurance - Individual Market Stabilization - Provider Fee
House 2/01/2019 2/01/2019 Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
House 3/15/2019 3/15/2019 Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
House 3/15/2019 3/12/2019 Favorable with Amendments {746281/1 Adopted 47
House 3/15/2019 3/12/2019 Floor Amendment {773425/1 (Delegate Cullison) Adopted 47
House 3/15/2019 3/12/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 47
Text - Third - Health Insurance - Individual Market Stabilization - Provider Fee
House 3/16/2019 3/13/2019 Third Reading Passed (97-37) 48
Senate 3/18/2019 3/15/2019 Referred Finance 47A
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Senate 3/25/2019 3/25/2019 Favorable Report by Finance
Senate 3/27/2019 3/23/2019 Favorable Adopted 55
Senate 3/27/2019 3/23/2019 Second Reading Passed 55
Senate 3/28/2019 3/24/2019 Third Reading Passed (40-7) 56
House 3/29/2019 3/21/2019 Returned Passed 56
Post Passage 5/25/2019 5/25/2019 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 597
Text - Chapter - Health Insurance - Individual Market Stabilization - Provider Fee
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   15-102.3 )
(   6-102.1 )
(   2017, 2018 )
Last Updated: 11/22/2019 9:32 AM