Bill Search
Bill number does not exist.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
To Governor
Title
Environment - Testing for Lead in Drinking Water - Public and Nonpublic Schools
Sponsored by
Delegates Lafferty, Platt, Bromwell, Glenn, Hettleman, Lierman, McIntosh, Oaks, Rosenberg, M. Washington, Hayes, Ali, Ebersole, Mosby, Turner, and Wilkins
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 386
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring the Department of the Environment, in consultation with the State Department of Education, the Department of General Services, and Maryland Occupational Safety and Health, to adopt regulations, under specified circumstances, to require periodic testing for the presence of lead in drinking water outlets in occupied public or nonpublic school buildings; requiring the Department of the Environment, before adopting regulations, to gather specified information regarding the establishment of lead-free school environments; etc.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2017
History
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/23/2017 1/23/2017 First Reading Environment and Transportation and Ways and Means
Text - First - Environment - Testing for Lead in Drinking Water - Public and Nonpublic Schools
House 1/25/2017 1/25/2017 Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m. (Environment and Transportation)
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
House 3/20/2017 3/20/2017 Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
House 3/20/2017 3/16/2017 Favorable with Amendments {690012/1 Adopted 50
House 3/20/2017 3/16/2017 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 50
Text - Third - Environment - Testing for Lead in Drinking Water - Public and Nonpublic Schools
House 3/20/2017 3/17/2017 Third Reading Passed (117-23) 51
Senate 3/20/2017 3/17/2017 Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 46A
Senate 3/22/2017 3/22/2017 Hearing 4/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/29/2017 3/29/2017 Hearing canceled
Senate 3/29/2017 3/29/2017 Hearing 4/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 4/07/2017 4/07/2017 Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 4/10/2017 4/02/2017 Favorable Adopted 62
Senate 4/10/2017 4/02/2017 Second Reading Passed 62
Senate 4/10/2017 4/03/2017 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 63A
House 4/10/2017 4/04/2017 Returned Passed 69
Post Passage 5/04/2017 5/04/2017 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 386
Text - Chapter - Environment - Testing for Lead in Drinking Water - Public and Nonpublic Schools
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   6-1501, 6-1502 )
Last Updated: 11/13/2019 12:51 PM