Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
To Governor
Title
Election Law - Registration and Voting at Precinct Polling Places
Sponsored by
Delegates Reznik, Bagnall, Brooks, Cardin, Charkoudian, Ebersole, Hettleman, Jones, R. Lewis, Lierman, Love, Luedtke, McIntosh, Moon, Palakovich Carr, Qi, Sample-Hughes, Solomon, Stewart, Terrasa, Valderrama, Smith, Guyton, Wilkins, Patterson, Kaiser, Washington, Mosby, Turner, Ivey, Feldmark, D. Barnes
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 609
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Providing an exception to the voter registration deadline to allow an individual to appear, on election day, at a precinct polling place in the individual's county of residence and apply to register to vote; requiring an applicant for voter registration on election day to provide certain proof of residency; requiring the State Board of Elections to take appropriate measures to notify potential registrants of the correct precinct polling place for the potential registrants' residence addresses under certain circumstances; etc.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2019
Bill imposes a local government mandate which is a directive in a bill requiring a local government unit to perform a task or assume a responsibility that has a discernible fiscal impact on the local government unit
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/25/2019
Legislative Date
1/25/2019
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/25/2019
Legislative Date
1/25/2019
Action
Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Election Law - Registration and Voting at Precinct Polling Places
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/18/2019
Legislative Date
2/18/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/20/2019
Legislative Date
2/20/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {575266/1 Adopted
Proceedings
31
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/20/2019
Legislative Date
2/20/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
31
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Election Law - Registration and Voting at Precinct Polling Places
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/22/2019
Legislative Date
2/22/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (98-41)
Proceedings
33
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/25/2019
Legislative Date
2/25/2019
Action
Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
33
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/22/2019
Legislative Date
3/22/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/22/2019
Legislative Date
3/20/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {544135/1 Adopted
Proceedings
52
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/22/2019
Legislative Date
3/20/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
52
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/25/2019
Legislative Date
3/21/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (32-15)
Proceedings
53
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/01/2019
Legislative Date
3/22/2019
Action
House Concurs Senate Amendments
Proceedings
57
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/01/2019
Legislative Date
3/22/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (97-39)
Proceedings
57
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/01/2019
Legislative Date
3/22/2019
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Enrolled - Election Law - Registration and Voting at Precinct Polling Places
Proceedings
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/25/2019
Legislative Date
5/25/2019
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 609
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Election Law - Registration and Voting at Precinct Polling Places
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/25/2019 1/25/2019 First Reading Ways and Means
House 1/25/2019 1/25/2019 Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Election Law - Registration and Voting at Precinct Polling Places
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
House 2/18/2019 2/18/2019 Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
House 2/20/2019 2/20/2019 Favorable with Amendments {575266/1 Adopted 31
House 2/20/2019 2/20/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 31
Text - Third - Election Law - Registration and Voting at Precinct Polling Places
House 2/22/2019 2/22/2019 Third Reading Passed (98-41) 33
Senate 2/25/2019 2/25/2019 Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 33
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/22/2019 3/22/2019 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/22/2019 3/20/2019 Favorable with Amendments {544135/1 Adopted 52
Senate 3/22/2019 3/20/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 52
Senate 3/25/2019 3/21/2019 Third Reading Passed (32-15) 53
House 4/01/2019 3/22/2019 House Concurs Senate Amendments 57
House 4/01/2019 3/22/2019 Third Reading Passed (97-39) 57
House 4/01/2019 3/22/2019 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Election Law - Registration and Voting at Precinct Polling Places
Post Passage 5/25/2019 5/25/2019 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 609
Text - Chapter - Election Law - Registration and Voting at Precinct Polling Places
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   3-302, 3-306 )
Last Updated: 1/19/2020 9:23 AM