Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Prince George's County - Alcoholic Beverages - Licenses for Supermarkets PG 308-20
Sponsored by
Prince George's County Delegation
Status
In the House - Hearing canceled
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing the Board of License Commissioners for Prince George's County to issue a Class A beer and light wine license for use in a supermarket that has a minimum investment of at least $500,000 in the supermarket facilities, not including the cost of land or buildings.
Committees
Original:
Economic Matters
Committee Testimony
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2020
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/20/2020
Legislative Date
1/20/2020
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/21/2020
Legislative Date
1/21/2020
Action
Hearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/03/2020
Legislative Date
2/03/2020
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/03/2020
Legislative Date
2/03/2020
Action
Hearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/14/2020
Legislative Date
2/14/2020
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/20/2020
Legislative Date
2/20/2020
Action
Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/02/2020
Legislative Date
3/02/2020
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/20/2020 1/20/2020 First Reading Economic Matters
Text - First - Prince George's County - Alcoholic Beverages - Licenses for Supermarkets PG 308-20
House 1/21/2020 1/21/2020 Hearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/03/2020 2/03/2020 Hearing canceled
House 2/03/2020 2/03/2020 Hearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/14/2020 2/14/2020 Hearing canceled
House 2/20/2020 2/20/2020 Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/02/2020 3/02/2020 Hearing canceled
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   26-102, 26-1501, 26-1509 )
Last Updated: 9/22/2020 1:43 PM