Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Public Health - Sale and Distribution of Products Containing NMP and DCM - Prohibition
Sponsored by
Delegates Hill, Cain, Ebersole, Krimm, R. Lewis, Shetty, Smith, and Valderrama
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Prohibiting, on or after January 1, 2021, the sale or distribution of any paint or coating removal product that contains N-Methylpyrrolidone or methylene chloride, also known as dichloromethane; and establishing that a person that violates the provision or any regulation adopted by the Secretary of Health to carry out the provision is guilty of a misdemeanor and subject to a fine not to exceed $1,000 for each violation.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0082
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2019
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/28/2019
Legislative Date
1/28/2019
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/31/2019
Legislative Date
1/31/2019
Action
Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2019
Legislative Date
4/04/2019
Action
Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/28/2019 1/28/2019 First Reading Health and Government Operations
Text - First - Public Health - Sale and Distribution of Products Containing NMP and DCM - Prohibition
House 1/31/2019 1/31/2019 Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
House 4/04/2019 4/04/2019 Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM