Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Criminal Procedure - Expungement of Records
Sponsored by
Delegates Carter, Anderson, Barron, Branch, Conaway, Glass, Glenn, Gutierrez, Haynes, Jalisi, Lierman, McCray, Moon, Oaks, Pena-Melnyk, Proctor, B. Robinson, Rosenberg, Smith, and Vallario
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 314
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Repealing a provision of law that provides that a person is not entitled to expungement of the person's record if the petition for expungement is based on a specified case disposition other than a specified entry of a probation before judgment within 3 years and the person, since the disposition, has been convicted of a crime other than a minor traffic violation or a specified crime; providing that a person is not entitled to expungement of the person's record if the person is a defendant in a pending criminal proceeding; etc.
Committees
Original:
Judiciary  
Opposite:
Judicial Proceedings  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0652
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0372 Session: 2003 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2015
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/03/2015
Legislative Date
2/04/2015
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/05/2015
Legislative Date
2/05/2015
Action
Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/06/2015
Legislative Date
3/09/2015
Action
Favorable Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/10/2015
Legislative Date
3/10/2015
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
40
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/10/2015
Legislative Date
3/10/2015
Action
Special Order until 3/13 (Delegate Szeliga) Adopted
Proceedings
40
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/13/2015
Legislative Date
3/13/2015
Action
Floor Amendment (Delegate Vallario) {113923/1 Adopted
Proceedings
43
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/13/2015
Legislative Date
3/13/2015
Action
Special Order until 3/17 (Delegate Anderson) Adopted
Proceedings
43
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2015
Legislative Date
3/14/2015
Action
Floor Amendment (Delegate C. Wilson) {783529/1 Adopted
Proceedings
44
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2015
Legislative Date
3/14/2015
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
44
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2015
Legislative Date
3/15/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed (95-45)
Proceedings
45A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2015
Legislative Date
3/19/2015
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
46
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/24/2015
Legislative Date
3/24/2015
Action
Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2015
Legislative Date
4/09/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2015
Legislative Date
4/02/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments {118374/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
60
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2015
Legislative Date
4/02/2015
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
60
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2015
Legislative Date
4/03/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed with Amendments (44-3)
Proceedings
61
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2015
Legislative Date
4/06/2015
Action
House Refuses to Concur - Senate Amendments
Proceedings
67
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2015
Legislative Date
4/06/2015
Action
House Requests Senate Recede
Proceedings
67
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2015
Legislative Date
4/06/2015
Action
Conference Committee Appointed
Proceedings
67
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2015
Legislative Date
4/06/2015
Action
Delegates Anderson, Moon, and Glass
Proceedings
67
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/13/2015
Legislative Date
4/05/2015
Action
Senate Refuses to Recede
Proceedings
63
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/13/2015
Legislative Date
4/05/2015
Action
Conference Committee Appointed
Proceedings
63
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/13/2015
Legislative Date
4/05/2015
Action
Senators Muse, Hough, and Ramirez
Proceedings
63
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/13/2015
Legislative Date
4/11/2015
Action
Conference Committee Report Adopted
Proceedings
72
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/13/2015
Legislative Date
4/11/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed (89-49)
Proceedings
72
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/13/2015
Legislative Date
4/10/2015
Action
Conference Committee Report Adopted
Proceedings
68
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/13/2015
Legislative Date
4/10/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed (35-12)
Proceedings
68
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/13/2015
Legislative Date
4/11/2015
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
68
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/12/2015
Legislative Date
5/12/2015
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 314
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/03/2015 2/04/2015 First Reading Judiciary
House 2/05/2015 2/05/2015 Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/06/2015 3/09/2015 Favorable Report by Judiciary
House 3/10/2015 3/10/2015 Favorable Report Adopted 40
House 3/10/2015 3/10/2015 Special Order until 3/13 (Delegate Szeliga) Adopted 40
House 3/13/2015 3/13/2015 Floor Amendment (Delegate Vallario) {113923/1 Adopted 43
House 3/13/2015 3/13/2015 Special Order until 3/17 (Delegate Anderson) Adopted 43
House 3/17/2015 3/14/2015 Floor Amendment (Delegate C. Wilson) {783529/1 Adopted 44
House 3/17/2015 3/14/2015 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 44
House 3/18/2015 3/15/2015 Third Reading Passed (95-45) 45A
Senate 3/19/2015 3/19/2015 First Reading Judicial Proceedings 46
Senate 3/24/2015 3/24/2015 Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 4/08/2015 4/09/2015 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 4/09/2015 4/02/2015 Favorable with Amendments {118374/1 Report Adopted 60
Senate 4/09/2015 4/02/2015 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 60
Senate 4/10/2015 4/03/2015 Third Reading Passed with Amendments (44-3) 61
House 4/11/2015 4/06/2015 House Refuses to Concur - Senate Amendments 67
House 4/11/2015 4/06/2015 House Requests Senate Recede 67
House 4/11/2015 4/06/2015 Conference Committee Appointed 67
House 4/11/2015 4/06/2015 Delegates Anderson, Moon, and Glass 67
Senate 4/13/2015 4/05/2015 Senate Refuses to Recede 63
Senate 4/13/2015 4/05/2015 Conference Committee Appointed 63
Senate 4/13/2015 4/05/2015 Senators Muse, Hough, and Ramirez 63
House 4/13/2015 4/11/2015 Conference Committee Report Adopted 72
House 4/13/2015 4/11/2015 Third Reading Passed (89-49) 72
Senate 4/13/2015 4/10/2015 Conference Committee Report Adopted 68
Senate 4/13/2015 4/10/2015 Third Reading Passed (35-12) 68
House 4/13/2015 4/11/2015 Passed Enrolled 68
Post Passage 5/12/2015 5/12/2015 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 314
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM