Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
State Personnel - Rights and Protections for Nursing Mothers
Sponsored by
Delegates Krimm, Barve, Chang, Ebersole, Fennell, Haynes, Hill, C. Howard, Jones, Lam, Tarlau, Pena-Melnyk, Gaines, Miele, Hettleman, Valentino-Smith, and A. Miller
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 179
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring the State, through its appropriate officers and employees, to provide a reasonable break time for an employee to express breast milk for her nursing child after the child's birth each time the employee needs to express the milk and, on notice, to provide a certain place that may be used by an employee to express breast milk; and prohibiting the State from being required to compensate an employee receiving reasonable break time for any time spent expressing breast milk at work.
Committees
Original:
Appropriations  
Opposite:
Finance  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2018
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/22/2018
Legislative Date
1/22/2018
Action
First Reading Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - State Personnel - Rights and Protections for Nursing Mothers
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/26/2018
Legislative Date
1/26/2018
Action
Hearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/19/2018
Legislative Date
2/19/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/20/2018
Legislative Date
2/20/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {744766/1 Adopted
Proceedings
30
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/20/2018
Legislative Date
2/20/2018
Action
Floor Amendment {373826/1 (Delegate Rey) Adopted
Proceedings
30
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/20/2018
Legislative Date
2/20/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
30
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - State Personnel - Rights and Protections for Nursing Mothers
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/22/2018
Legislative Date
2/22/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (135-0)
Proceedings
32
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/23/2018
Legislative Date
2/23/2018
Action
Referred Finance
Proceedings
33
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2018
Legislative Date
3/14/2018
Action
Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/29/2018
Legislative Date
3/29/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/29/2018
Legislative Date
3/26/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {547772/1 Adopted
Proceedings
57
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/29/2018
Legislative Date
3/26/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
57
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/30/2018
Legislative Date
3/27/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
58
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2018
Legislative Date
3/27/2018
Action
House Concurs Senate Amendments
Proceedings
61
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2018
Legislative Date
3/27/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (137-0)
Proceedings
61
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2018
Legislative Date
3/27/2018
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Enrolled - State Personnel - Rights and Protections for Nursing Mothers
Proceedings
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/24/2018
Legislative Date
4/24/2018
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 179
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - State Personnel - Rights and Protections for Nursing Mothers
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/22/2018 1/22/2018 First Reading Appropriations
Text - First - State Personnel - Rights and Protections for Nursing Mothers
House 1/26/2018 1/26/2018 Hearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
House 2/19/2018 2/19/2018 Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
House 2/20/2018 2/20/2018 Favorable with Amendments {744766/1 Adopted 30
House 2/20/2018 2/20/2018 Floor Amendment {373826/1 (Delegate Rey) Adopted 30
House 2/20/2018 2/20/2018 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 30
Text - Third - State Personnel - Rights and Protections for Nursing Mothers
House 2/22/2018 2/22/2018 Third Reading Passed (135-0) 32
Senate 2/23/2018 2/23/2018 Referred Finance 33
Senate 3/14/2018 3/14/2018 Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Senate 3/29/2018 3/29/2018 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 3/29/2018 3/26/2018 Favorable with Amendments {547772/1 Adopted 57
Senate 3/29/2018 3/26/2018 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 57
Senate 3/30/2018 3/27/2018 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 58
House 4/05/2018 3/27/2018 House Concurs Senate Amendments 61
House 4/05/2018 3/27/2018 Third Reading Passed (137-0) 61
House 4/05/2018 3/27/2018 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - State Personnel - Rights and Protections for Nursing Mothers
Post Passage 4/24/2018 4/24/2018 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 179
Text - Chapter - State Personnel - Rights and Protections for Nursing Mothers
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM