Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Public Safety - Law Enforcement Officers - Video Cameras
Sponsored by
Delegates Conaway, Carter, Glenn, Haynes, Moon, Oaks, B. Robinson, and Smith
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing a law enforcement officer to wear a video camera affixed to the law enforcement officer's uniform while on duty; requiring that a recording be preserved by a law enforcement agency for at least 30 calendar days; providing that it is lawful under a specified provision of law for a specified law enforcement officer to intercept a specified oral communication; etc.
Committees
Original:
Judiciary  
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0116 Session: 2014 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2015
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/03/2015
Legislative Date
2/04/2015
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/11/2015
Legislative Date
2/11/2015
Action
Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2015
Legislative Date
3/19/2015
Action
Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/03/2015 2/04/2015 First Reading Judiciary
House 2/11/2015 2/11/2015 Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/19/2015 3/19/2015 Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM