Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Frederick County - Career Exploration and Development Activities - Coffee
Sponsored by
Frederick County Delegation
Status
In the Senate - First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Prohibiting an Executive Branch agency from banning or regulating the sale of coffee in conjunction with a career exploration and development activity in a public high school in Frederick County, if the activity is directed at or organized by students with individualized education programs; and repealing an exception for a career exploration and development activity in a public high school in Frederick County that sold coffee on or before June 30, 2018.
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0317
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2020
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/20/2020
Legislative Date
1/20/2020
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/21/2020
Legislative Date
1/21/2020
Action
Hearing 2/05 at 2:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/13/2020
Legislative Date
3/13/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/13/2020
Legislative Date
3/10/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments {145466/1 Adopted
Proceedings
47A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/13/2020
Legislative Date
3/10/2020
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
47A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2020
Legislative Date
3/11/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (129-0)
Proceedings
48
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2020
Legislative Date
3/10/2020
Action
Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
49
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/20/2020 1/20/2020 First Reading Ways and Means
Text - First - Frederick County - Career Exploration and Development Activities - Coffee
House 1/21/2020 1/21/2020 Hearing 2/05 at 2:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
House 3/13/2020 3/13/2020 Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
House 3/13/2020 3/10/2020 Favorable with Amendments {145466/1 Adopted 47A
House 3/13/2020 3/10/2020 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 47A
Text - Third - Frederick County - Career Exploration and Development Activities - Coffee
House 3/14/2020 3/11/2020 Third Reading Passed (129-0) 48
Senate 3/15/2020 3/10/2020 Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 49
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 3/17/2020 2:11 PM