Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

HB0311


CH0161

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Courts - Court Dog and Child Witness Program - Established
Sponsored by
Delegates Malone, Arikan, and Ciliberti
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 161
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Establishing the Court Dog and Child Witness Program to provide a facility dog or therapy dog to a child witness in any circuit court proceeding or other related court process, meeting, or interview; providing participation in the Program by a circuit court is voluntary; requiring participating courts to adhere to the procedures adopted by the Administrative Office of the Courts; requiring the Administrative Office of the Courts to develop a plan to implement the Program and ensure the details are publicly available; etc.
Committees
Original:
Judiciary  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0101
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2020
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/20/2020
Legislative Date
1/20/2020
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Courts - Court Dog and Child Witness Program - Established
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/21/2020
Legislative Date
1/21/2020
Action
Hearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2020
Legislative Date
2/10/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/11/2020
Legislative Date
2/11/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments {412219/1 Adopted
Proceedings
25
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/11/2020
Legislative Date
2/11/2020
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
25
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Courts - Court Dog and Child Witness Program - Established
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/13/2020
Legislative Date
2/13/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (129-0)
Proceedings
27
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/14/2020
Legislative Date
2/14/2020
Action
Referred Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
28
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2020
Legislative Date
3/14/2020
Action
Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2020
Legislative Date
3/09/2020
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
48
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2020
Legislative Date
3/10/2020
Action
Motion Special Order until 3/17 (Senator Simonaire) Adopted
Proceedings
49
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/12/2020
Action
Floor Amendment {213427/2 (Senator Simonaire) Adopted
Proceedings
51A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/12/2020
Action
Third Readings Passed with Amendments (44-0)
Proceedings
51A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/14/2020
Action
House Concurs Senate Amendments
Proceedings
51A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/14/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (134-0)
Proceedings
51A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/14/2020
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Enrolled - Courts - Court Dog and Child Witness Program - Established
Proceedings
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/08/2020
Legislative Date
5/08/2020
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 161
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/20/2020 1/20/2020 First Reading Judiciary
Text - First - Courts - Court Dog and Child Witness Program - Established
House 1/21/2020 1/21/2020 Hearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
House 2/10/2020 2/10/2020 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
House 2/11/2020 2/11/2020 Favorable with Amendments {412219/1 Adopted 25
House 2/11/2020 2/11/2020 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 25
Text - Third - Courts - Court Dog and Child Witness Program - Established
House 2/13/2020 2/13/2020 Third Reading Passed (129-0) 27
Senate 2/14/2020 2/14/2020 Referred Judicial Proceedings 28
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/14/2020 3/14/2020 Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/14/2020 3/09/2020 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 48
Senate 3/15/2020 3/10/2020 Motion Special Order until 3/17 (Senator Simonaire) Adopted 49
Senate 3/17/2020 3/12/2020 Floor Amendment {213427/2 (Senator Simonaire) Adopted 51A
Senate 3/17/2020 3/12/2020 Third Readings Passed with Amendments (44-0) 51A
House 3/17/2020 3/14/2020 House Concurs Senate Amendments 51A
House 3/17/2020 3/14/2020 Third Reading Passed (134-0) 51A
House 3/17/2020 3/14/2020 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Courts - Court Dog and Child Witness Program - Established
Post Passage 5/08/2020 5/08/2020 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 161
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   2016, 2017, 2019 )
Last Updated: 5/11/2020 4:12 PM