Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

HB0315


CH0164

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Public Ethics Violations and Crimes – Prohibitions and Penalties
Sponsored by
Delegates Stewart, Attar, Barron, Boyce, Carr, Charkoudian, Ebersole, Feldmark, Fraser-Hidalgo, Guyton, Hettleman, Kerr, Lehman, R. Lewis, Lierman, Love, Moon, Palakovich Carr, Shetty, Solomon, Terrasa, Wells, and P. Young
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 164
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Increasing certain penalties for bribery relating to a public employee; prohibiting, subject to a certain exception, a former secretary of a principal department of the Executive Branch from assisting or representing another party for compensation, for one calendar year from the date the secretary leaves State office, in a matter that is the subject of legislative action.
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0202
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2020
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/20/2020
Legislative Date
1/20/2020
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/21/2020
Legislative Date
1/21/2020
Action
Hearing 2/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/21/2020
Legislative Date
1/21/2020
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/21/2020
Legislative Date
1/21/2020
Action
Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/09/2020
Legislative Date
3/09/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/10/2020
Legislative Date
3/07/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments {650015/1 Adopted
Proceedings
44
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/10/2020
Legislative Date
3/07/2020
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
44
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Public Ethics Violations and Crimes – Prohibitions and Penalties
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/11/2020
Legislative Date
3/08/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (137-1)
Proceedings
45
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/12/2020
Legislative Date
3/07/2020
Action
Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
46
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2020
Legislative Date
3/18/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2020
Legislative Date
3/14/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments {444337/1 Adopted
Proceedings
53A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2020
Legislative Date
3/14/2020
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
53A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2020
Legislative Date
3/15/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
53C
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2020
Legislative Date
3/16/2020
Action
House Concurs Senate Amendments
Proceedings
53
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2020
Legislative Date
3/16/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (130-0)
Proceedings
53
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2020
Legislative Date
3/16/2020
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Enrolled - Public Ethics Violations and Crimes – Prohibitions and Penalties
Proceedings
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/08/2020
Legislative Date
5/08/2020
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 164
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/20/2020 1/20/2020 First Reading Environment and Transportation
Text - First - Public Ethics - Executive Branch - Lobbying by Former Secretaries of Principal Departments (Shut the Revolving Door Act of 2020)
House 1/21/2020 1/21/2020 Hearing 2/05 at 1:00 p.m.
House 1/21/2020 1/21/2020 Hearing canceled
House 1/21/2020 1/21/2020 Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
House 3/09/2020 3/09/2020 Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
House 3/10/2020 3/07/2020 Favorable with Amendments {650015/1 Adopted 44
House 3/10/2020 3/07/2020 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 44
Text - Third - Public Ethics Violations and Crimes – Prohibitions and Penalties
House 3/11/2020 3/08/2020 Third Reading Passed (137-1) 45
Senate 3/12/2020 3/07/2020 Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 46
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/18/2020 3/18/2020 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/18/2020 3/14/2020 Favorable with Amendments {444337/1 Adopted 53A
Senate 3/18/2020 3/14/2020 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 53A
Senate 3/18/2020 3/15/2020 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 53C
House 3/18/2020 3/16/2020 House Concurs Senate Amendments 53
House 3/18/2020 3/16/2020 Third Reading Passed (130-0) 53
House 3/18/2020 3/16/2020 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Public Ethics Violations and Crimes – Prohibitions and Penalties
Post Passage 5/08/2020 5/08/2020 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 164
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 5/11/2020 4:12 PM