Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Criminal Law - Exploitation of Vulnerable Adult or Elderly Individual - Undue Influence
Sponsored by
Delegates Shetty, Carr, Atterbeary, Ebersole, Feldmark, Guyton, Hill, Kelly, Kerr, Korman, Lehman, Love, Moon, Palakovich Carr, Solomon, Stewart, Terrasa, Valderrama, and Wilkins
Status
In the Senate - First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Altering the definition of "undue influence" for purposes of provisions of law prohibiting the exploitation of certain vulnerable adults or individuals at least 68 years old that results in inequity; requiring a court, in determining whether a transfer of property was induced by undue influence, to consider certain factors; and applying the Act prospectively.
Committees
Original:
Judiciary  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0702
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2020
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/20/2020
Legislative Date
1/20/2020
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/21/2020
Legislative Date
1/21/2020
Action
Hearing 2/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/24/2020
Legislative Date
2/24/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/25/2020
Legislative Date
2/25/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments {132511/1 Adopted
Proceedings
35
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/25/2020
Legislative Date
2/25/2020
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
35
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/27/2020
Legislative Date
2/27/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (137-0)
Proceedings
37
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/28/2020
Legislative Date
2/28/2020
Action
Referred Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
38
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/20/2020 1/20/2020 First Reading Judiciary
Text - First - Criminal Law - Exploitation of Vulnerable Adult or Elderly Individual - Undue Influence
House 1/21/2020 1/21/2020 Hearing 2/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
House 2/24/2020 2/24/2020 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
House 2/25/2020 2/25/2020 Favorable with Amendments {132511/1 Adopted 35
House 2/25/2020 2/25/2020 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 35
Text - Third - Criminal Law - Exploitation of Vulnerable Adult or Elderly Individual - Undue Influence
House 2/27/2020 2/27/2020 Third Reading Passed (137-0) 37
Senate 2/28/2020 2/28/2020 Referred Judicial Proceedings 38
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 3/14/2020 5:58 PM