Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
State Government - Office of Legislative Audits - Costs and Frequency of Audits
Sponsored by
Chair, Joint Audit Committee
Status
In the Senate - Third Reading Passed with Amendments (45-0)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Repealing the requirement that the cost of the fiscal portion of postaudit examinations of the Environmental Trust Fund be an operating cost of the Environmental Trust Fund; repealing the requirement that the cost of the fiscal portion of the audits of the 9-1-1 Trust Fund be paid from the 9-1-1 Trust Fund as an administrative cost; repealing the requirement that the cost of the fiscal portion of the postaudit examinations of the Universal Service Trust Fund be paid from the Universal Service Trust Fund as an administrative cost; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0301
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2020
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/20/2020
Legislative Date
1/20/2020
Action
First Reading Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/24/2020
Legislative Date
1/24/2020
Action
Hearing 2/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2020
Legislative Date
2/10/2020
Action
Favorable Report by Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/11/2020
Legislative Date
2/11/2020
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
25
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/13/2020
Legislative Date
2/13/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (131-0)
Proceedings
27
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/14/2020
Legislative Date
2/14/2020
Action
Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
28
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/17/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/12/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments {954632/1 Adopted
Proceedings
51A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/12/2020
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
51A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/13/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
52
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/20/2020 1/20/2020 First Reading Appropriations
Text - First - State Government - Office of Legislative Audits - Costs and Frequency of Audits
House 1/24/2020 1/24/2020 Hearing 2/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
House 2/10/2020 2/10/2020 Favorable Report by Appropriations
House 2/11/2020 2/11/2020 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 25
Text - Third - State Government - Office of Legislative Audits - Costs and Frequency of Audits
House 2/13/2020 2/13/2020 Third Reading Passed (131-0) 27
Senate 2/14/2020 2/14/2020 Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 28
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/17/2020 3/17/2020 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/17/2020 3/12/2020 Favorable with Amendments {954632/1 Adopted 51A
Senate 3/17/2020 3/12/2020 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 51A
Senate 3/17/2020 3/13/2020 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 52
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 3/23/2020 9:02 AM