Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Civilian Federal Employees – Unemployment Insurance Benefits and Federal Government Shutdown Employee Assistance Loan Fund (Federal Shutdown Paycheck Protection Act)
Sponsored by
Delegates Feldmark, Acevero, Attar, Atterbeary, Bagnall, Bartlett, Barve, Bhandari, Boyce, Branch, Bridges, Brooks, Busch, Cain, Cardin, Carey, Chang, Charkoudian, Charles, Clippinger, Conaway, Crosby, Crutchfield, Cullison, D.M. Davis, D.E. Davis, Dumais, Ebersole, Fennell, W. Fisher, Fraser-Hidalgo, Gilchrist, Glenn, Guyton, Harrison, Healey, Hettleman, Hill, Jackson, Johnson, Jones, Kaiser, Kelly, Kerr, Korman, Krimm, Lafferty, Lehman, J. Lewis, R. Lewis, Lierman, Lopez, Love, Luedtke, McIntosh, Moon, Mosby, Palakovich Carr, Patterson, Pena-Melnyk, Pendergrass, Qi, Queen, Reznik, Rogers, Rosenberg, Sample-Hughes, Shetty, Smith, Solomon, Stein, Stewart, Sydnor, Terrasa, Turner, Valderrama, Walker, C. Watson, R. Watson, Wells, Wilkins, Wilson, K. Young, Lisanti, and P. Young
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 1
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Specifying that an individual who is a civilian employee of the federal government is eligible to receive unemployment benefits under certain circumstances; altering the purpose of the Catastrophic Event Account to enable the State to respond to federal civilian employee financial hardship from a full or partial federal government shutdown due to a lapse in federal appropriations; establishing a certain loan fund to provide loans to civilian employees of the federal government under certain circumstances; etc.
Committees
Original:
Economic Matters  
Opposite:
Finance
Details
Emergency Bill
Cross-filed with: SB0391
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): Upon Enactment
Contingency - on a contingency described in Sec. 4 of the bill
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/28/2019
Legislative Date
1/28/2019
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/29/2019
Legislative Date
1/29/2019
Action
Hearing 1/31 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/13/2019
Legislative Date
2/13/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/13/2019
Legislative Date
2/13/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {643698/1 Adopted
Proceedings
26
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/13/2019
Legislative Date
2/13/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
26
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/14/2019
Legislative Date
2/14/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (119-20)
Proceedings
27
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/15/2019
Legislative Date
2/15/2019
Action
Referred Finance
Proceedings
27
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/07/2019
Legislative Date
3/07/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/07/2019
Legislative Date
3/07/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {597779/1 Adopted
Proceedings
41
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/07/2019
Legislative Date
3/07/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
41
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/11/2019
Legislative Date
3/11/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-1)
Proceedings
43
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2019
Legislative Date
3/11/2019
Action
House Concurs Senate Amendments
Proceedings
46A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2019
Legislative Date
3/11/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (110-27)
Proceedings
46A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2019
Legislative Date
3/11/2019
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
3/26/2019
Legislative Date
3/26/2019
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 1
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/28/2019 1/28/2019 First Reading Economic Matters
House 1/29/2019 1/29/2019 Hearing 1/31 at 1:30 p.m.
Text - First - Unemployment Insurance - Civilian Federal Employees - Benefits (Federal Shutdown Paycheck Protection Act)
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
House 2/13/2019 2/13/2019 Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
House 2/13/2019 2/13/2019 Favorable with Amendments {643698/1 Adopted 26
House 2/13/2019 2/13/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 26
Text - Third - Civilian Federal Employees – Unemployment Insurance Benefits and Federal Government Shutdown Employee Assistance Loan Fund (Federal Shutdown Paycheck Protection Act)
House 2/14/2019 2/14/2019 Third Reading Passed (119-20) 27
Senate 2/15/2019 2/15/2019 Referred Finance 27
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Senate 3/07/2019 3/07/2019 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 3/07/2019 3/07/2019 Favorable with Amendments {597779/1 Adopted 41
Senate 3/07/2019 3/07/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 41
Senate 3/11/2019 3/11/2019 Third Reading Passed (46-1) 43
House 3/14/2019 3/11/2019 House Concurs Senate Amendments 46A
House 3/14/2019 3/11/2019 Third Reading Passed (110-27) 46A
House 3/14/2019 3/11/2019 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Civilian Federal Employees – Unemployment Insurance Benefits and Federal Government Shutdown Employee Assistance Loan Fund (Federal Shutdown Paycheck Protection Act)
Post Passage 3/26/2019 3/26/2019 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 1
Text - Chapter - Civilian Federal Employees – Unemployment Insurance Benefits and Federal Government Shutdown Employee Assistance Loan Fund (Federal Shutdown Paycheck Protection Act)
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   6-226, 7-324, 7-327 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM