Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Human Services - Food Supplements (Summer SNAP for Children Act)
Sponsored by
Delegates Queen, Acevero, Bagnall, Barron, Bartlett, Cain, Cardin, Chang, Charkoudian, Crutchfield, Cullison, Dumais, Gaines, Gilchrist, Guyton, Haynes, Hettleman, Hill, Ivey, Jackson, Jones, Kelly, Korman, R. Lewis, Lierman, Lisanti, Love, Luedtke, McIntosh, McKay, Moon, Mosby, Palakovich Carr, Proctor, Qi, Sample-Hughes, Shetty, Solomon, Stewart, Valderrama, Valentino-Smith, Washington, C. Watson, Wilkins, and K. Young
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 635
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Renaming the food stamp program to be the food supplement program; requiring the State to provide matching funds to counties for a supplement for each child in a household that receives federally funded benefits under the food supplement program; providing for each eligible child a combined State and county supplement of $30 per month in June, July, and August, and $10 in December; requiring a county to submit a certain application by December 1 to receive certain funding; specifying the required State and local shares of funding; etc.
Committees
Original:
Appropriations  
Opposite:
Budget and Taxation  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0218
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2019
Bill imposes a mandated appropriation in the annual State Budget Bill
Bill imposes a local government mandate which is a directive in a bill requiring a local government unit to perform a task or assume a responsibility that has a discernible fiscal impact on the local government unit
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/28/2019
Legislative Date
1/28/2019
Action
First Reading Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Human Services - Food Supplements (Summer SNAP for Children Act)
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/29/2019
Legislative Date
1/29/2019
Action
Hearing 2/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/11/2019
Legislative Date
3/11/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2019
Legislative Date
3/09/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {244964/1 Adopted
Proceedings
44
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2019
Legislative Date
3/09/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
44
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Human Services - Food Supplements (Summer SNAP for Children Act)
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/13/2019
Legislative Date
3/10/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (118-21)
Proceedings
45
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2019
Legislative Date
3/14/2019
Action
Referred Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
46
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2019
Legislative Date
3/15/2019
Action
Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/22/2019
Legislative Date
3/22/2019
Action
Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/22/2019
Legislative Date
3/20/2019
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
52
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/25/2019
Legislative Date
3/21/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
53
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/26/2019
Legislative Date
3/18/2019
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
53A
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/25/2019
Legislative Date
5/25/2019
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 635
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Human Services - Food Supplements (Summer SNAP for Children Act)
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/28/2019 1/28/2019 First Reading Appropriations
Text - First - Human Services - Food Supplements (Summer SNAP for Children Act)
House 1/29/2019 1/29/2019 Hearing 2/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
House 3/11/2019 3/11/2019 Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
House 3/12/2019 3/09/2019 Favorable with Amendments {244964/1 Adopted 44
House 3/12/2019 3/09/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 44
Text - Third - Human Services - Food Supplements (Summer SNAP for Children Act)
House 3/13/2019 3/10/2019 Third Reading Passed (118-21) 45
Senate 3/14/2019 3/14/2019 Referred Budget and Taxation 46
Senate 3/15/2019 3/15/2019 Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/22/2019 3/22/2019 Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/22/2019 3/20/2019 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 52
Senate 3/25/2019 3/21/2019 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 53
House 3/26/2019 3/18/2019 Returned Passed 53A
Post Passage 5/25/2019 5/25/2019 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 635
Text - Chapter - Human Services - Food Supplements (Summer SNAP for Children Act)
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   5-501, 5-501.1 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM