Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Howard County - Board of Education - Salaries Ho. Co. 17-18
Sponsored by
Howard County Delegation
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 811
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Increasing from $17,000 to $18,000 the annual compensation received by the chair of the Howard County Board of Education; increasing from $15,000 to $16,000 the annual compensation of other elected officials of the county board; and providing that the Act does not apply to the salary of the chair and other elected members of the county board while serving in a term of office beginning before the effective date of the Act.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2018
Bill imposes a local government mandate which is a directive in a bill requiring a local government unit to perform a task or assume a responsibility that has a discernible fiscal impact on the local government unit
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/22/2018
Legislative Date
1/22/2018
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Howard County - Board of Education - Salaries Ho. Co. 17-18
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/25/2018
Legislative Date
1/25/2018
Action
Hearing 2/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/05/2018
Legislative Date
3/05/2018
Action
Favorable Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/06/2018
Legislative Date
3/06/2018
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
40
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Howard County - Board of Education - Salaries Ho. Co. 17-18
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/08/2018
Legislative Date
3/08/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (138-0)
Proceedings
42
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/09/2018
Legislative Date
3/09/2018
Action
Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
43
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2018
Legislative Date
3/15/2018
Action
Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/26/2018
Legislative Date
3/26/2018
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/27/2018
Legislative Date
3/23/2018
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
54
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/27/2018
Legislative Date
3/23/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
54
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/28/2018
Legislative Date
3/24/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
55
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/29/2018
Legislative Date
3/22/2018
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
56
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/26/2018
Legislative Date
5/26/2018
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 811
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Howard County - Board of Education - Salaries Ho. Co. 17-18
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/22/2018 1/22/2018 First Reading Ways and Means
Text - First - Howard County - Board of Education - Salaries Ho. Co. 17-18
House 1/25/2018 1/25/2018 Hearing 2/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
House 3/05/2018 3/05/2018 Favorable Report by Ways and Means
House 3/06/2018 3/06/2018 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 40
Text - Third - Howard County - Board of Education - Salaries Ho. Co. 17-18
House 3/08/2018 3/08/2018 Third Reading Passed (138-0) 42
Senate 3/09/2018 3/09/2018 Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 43
Senate 3/15/2018 3/15/2018 Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/26/2018 3/26/2018 Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/27/2018 3/23/2018 Favorable Adopted 54
Senate 3/27/2018 3/23/2018 Second Reading Passed 54
Senate 3/28/2018 3/24/2018 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 55
House 3/29/2018 3/22/2018 Returned Passed 56
Post Passage 5/26/2018 5/26/2018 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 811
Text - Chapter - Howard County - Board of Education - Salaries Ho. Co. 17-18
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   3-701, 3-702, 3-703 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM