Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Howard County - Alcoholic Beverages - Class C BWL License Ho. Co. 21-18
Sponsored by
Howard County Delegation
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing a Class C beer, wine, and liquor 7-day license in Howard County; specifying that the license authorizes the license holder to sell beer, wine, and liquor at retail at the place described in the license for on-premises consumption; and providing for an annual license fee of $500.
Committees
Original:
Economic Matters  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2018
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/22/2018
Legislative Date
1/22/2018
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/23/2018
Legislative Date
1/23/2018
Action
Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/06/2018
Legislative Date
3/06/2018
Action
Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/22/2018 1/22/2018 First Reading Economic Matters
Text - First - Howard County - Alcoholic Beverages - Class C BWL License Ho. Co. 21-18
House 1/23/2018 1/23/2018 Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
House 3/06/2018 3/06/2018 Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   23-102, 23-904 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM