Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Harford County - Charitable Gaming
Sponsored by
Delegate Impallaria
Status
In the House - Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Creating in Harford County a permit to be issued by the Sheriff of Harford County that authorizes specified nonprofit organizations to conduct a gaming contest; specifying requirements that organizations must meet to be issued a permit; limiting to four the number of gaming contests an organization may hold in a year; stating the location and hours for conducting a gaming contest; specifying that the maximum bet a single individual may place on a game is $10; etc.
Committees
Original:
Ways and Means  
Opposite:
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0130
Introduced in a prior session as: HB1287 Session: 2012 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2013
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/24/2013
Legislative Date
1/25/2013
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/30/2013
Legislative Date
1/30/2013
Action
Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/24/2013 1/25/2013 First Reading Ways and Means
House 1/30/2013 1/30/2013 Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
Date Posted Document Name
1/25/2013 Text - First - Harford County - Charitable Gaming
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   13-1512 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM