Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Office of Legislative Audits - Local School System Audits
Sponsored by
Delegates Ghrist, Arentz, Hornberger, S. Howard, Jacobs, and Jackson
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 261
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Exempting a local school system from a specified audit requirement if the county governing body, the county board of education, and the county delegation to the Maryland General Assembly each submits a letter to the Joint Audit Committee requesting an exemption on or before November 1 of Fiscal Year 2017, or on or before November 1 of the last year of a specified 6-year audit cycle; and authorizing the Joint Audit Committee to direct the Office of Legislative Audits to conduct an audit of a local school system at any time.
Committees
Original:
Appropriations  
Opposite:
Budget and Taxation  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/26/2016
Legislative Date
1/27/2016
Action
First Reading Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/27/2016
Legislative Date
1/27/2016
Action
Hearing 2/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/02/2016
Legislative Date
3/03/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/04/2016
Legislative Date
3/04/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments {684767/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
38
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/04/2016
Legislative Date
3/04/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
38
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/08/2016
Legislative Date
3/08/2016
Action
Motion Reconsider Second Reading (Delegate Jones) Adopted
Proceedings
40
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/08/2016
Legislative Date
3/08/2016
Action
Recommitted to Appropriations (Delegate Jones)
Proceedings
40
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/09/2016
Legislative Date
3/10/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/11/2016
Legislative Date
3/11/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments {244264/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
43
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/11/2016
Legislative Date
3/11/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
43
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2016
Legislative Date
3/12/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (137-0)
Proceedings
44
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2016
Legislative Date
3/16/2016
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
45
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2016
Legislative Date
3/18/2016
Action
Hearing 3/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/28/2016
Legislative Date
3/29/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/30/2016
Legislative Date
3/26/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments {539839/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
55
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/30/2016
Legislative Date
3/26/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
55
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/31/2016
Legislative Date
3/27/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed with Amendments (46-0)
Proceedings
56
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2016
Legislative Date
4/01/2016
Action
House Concur - Senate Amendments
Proceedings
64
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2016
Legislative Date
4/01/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (131-2)
Proceedings
64
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2016
Legislative Date
4/01/2016
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
64
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/26/2016
Legislative Date
4/26/2016
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 261
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/26/2016 1/27/2016 First Reading Appropriations
House 1/27/2016 1/27/2016 Hearing 2/09 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/02/2016 3/03/2016 Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
House 3/04/2016 3/04/2016 Favorable with Amendments {684767/1 Report Adopted 38
House 3/04/2016 3/04/2016 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 38
House 3/08/2016 3/08/2016 Motion Reconsider Second Reading (Delegate Jones) Adopted 40
House 3/08/2016 3/08/2016 Recommitted to Appropriations (Delegate Jones) 40
House 3/09/2016 3/10/2016 Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
House 3/11/2016 3/11/2016 Favorable with Amendments {244264/1 Report Adopted 43
House 3/11/2016 3/11/2016 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 43
House 3/15/2016 3/12/2016 Third Reading Passed (137-0) 44
Senate 3/16/2016 3/16/2016 First Reading Budget and Taxation 45
Senate 3/18/2016 3/18/2016 Hearing 3/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/28/2016 3/29/2016 Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/30/2016 3/26/2016 Favorable with Amendments {539839/1 Report Adopted 55
Senate 3/30/2016 3/26/2016 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 55
Senate 3/31/2016 3/27/2016 Third Reading Passed with Amendments (46-0) 56
House 4/07/2016 4/01/2016 House Concur - Senate Amendments 64
House 4/07/2016 4/01/2016 Third Reading Passed (131-2) 64
House 4/07/2016 4/01/2016 Passed Enrolled 64
Post Passage 4/26/2016 4/26/2016 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 261
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM