Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
To Governor
Title
Criminal Procedure - Seizure and Forfeiture
Sponsored by
Delegates Vallario, Morales, Anderson, Atterbeary, Campos, Carter, Conaway, Dumais, Frush, Glass, Jalisi, Kramer, Moon, Rey, Reznik, Rosenberg, Smith, Sydnor, Valentino-Smith, and Waldstreicher
Status
In the Senate - Third Reading Passed (87-51)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Repealing a presumption that specified money or weapons are forfeitable; prohibiting a seizing authority or prosecuting authority from directly or indirectly transferring seized property to a federal law enforcement authority or agency, with a specified exception; requiring a specified law enforcement agency to report, on an annual basis, specified information about each individual seizure and forfeiture completed by the agency under State or federal forfeiture law; etc.
Committees
Original:
Judiciary  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0528
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2015
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/04/2015
Legislative Date
2/05/2015
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/05/2015
Legislative Date
2/05/2015
Action
Hearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/17/2015
Legislative Date
2/17/2015
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/17/2015
Legislative Date
2/17/2015
Action
Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/27/2015
Legislative Date
3/02/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/03/2015
Legislative Date
3/03/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments {612410/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
35
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/03/2015
Legislative Date
3/03/2015
Action
Special Order until 3/5 (Delegate Kipke) Adopted
Proceedings
35
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/05/2015
Legislative Date
3/05/2015
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
37
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/10/2015
Legislative Date
3/10/2015
Action
Motion vote previous question (Delegate B. Barnes) Adopted
Proceedings
40
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/10/2015
Legislative Date
3/10/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed (81-54)
Proceedings
40
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/11/2015
Legislative Date
3/11/2015
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
40
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2015
Legislative Date
4/02/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2015
Legislative Date
3/28/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments {328479/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
55
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2015
Legislative Date
3/28/2015
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
55
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2015
Legislative Date
3/29/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed with Amendments (46-1)
Proceedings
56
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/10/2015
Legislative Date
4/04/2015
Action
House Refuses to Concur - Senate Amendments
Proceedings
65
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/10/2015
Legislative Date
4/04/2015
Action
House Requests Senate Recede
Proceedings
65
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/10/2015
Legislative Date
4/04/2015
Action
Conference Committee Appointed
Proceedings
65
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/10/2015
Legislative Date
4/04/2015
Action
Delegates Dumais, Sydnor, and Kittleman
Proceedings
65
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/13/2015
Legislative Date
4/05/2015
Action
Senate Refuses to Recede
Proceedings
63
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/13/2015
Legislative Date
4/05/2015
Action
Conference Committee Appointed
Proceedings
63
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/13/2015
Legislative Date
4/05/2015
Action
Senators Raskin, Ramirez, and Norman
Proceedings
63
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/13/2015
Legislative Date
4/11/2015
Action
Conference Committee Report Adopted
Proceedings
72
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/13/2015
Legislative Date
4/11/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed (85-53)
Proceedings
72
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/04/2015 2/05/2015 First Reading Judiciary
House 2/05/2015 2/05/2015 Hearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/17/2015 2/17/2015 Hearing cancelled
House 2/17/2015 2/17/2015 Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/27/2015 3/02/2015 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
House 3/03/2015 3/03/2015 Favorable with Amendments {612410/1 Report Adopted 35
House 3/03/2015 3/03/2015 Special Order until 3/5 (Delegate Kipke) Adopted 35
House 3/05/2015 3/05/2015 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 37
House 3/10/2015 3/10/2015 Motion vote previous question (Delegate B. Barnes) Adopted 40
House 3/10/2015 3/10/2015 Third Reading Passed (81-54) 40
Senate 3/11/2015 3/11/2015 First Reading Judicial Proceedings 40
Senate 4/01/2015 4/02/2015 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 4/02/2015 3/28/2015 Favorable with Amendments {328479/1 Report Adopted 55
Senate 4/02/2015 3/28/2015 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 55
Senate 4/03/2015 3/29/2015 Third Reading Passed with Amendments (46-1) 56
House 4/10/2015 4/04/2015 House Refuses to Concur - Senate Amendments 65
House 4/10/2015 4/04/2015 House Requests Senate Recede 65
House 4/10/2015 4/04/2015 Conference Committee Appointed 65
House 4/10/2015 4/04/2015 Delegates Dumais, Sydnor, and Kittleman 65
Senate 4/13/2015 4/05/2015 Senate Refuses to Recede 63
Senate 4/13/2015 4/05/2015 Conference Committee Appointed 63
Senate 4/13/2015 4/05/2015 Senators Raskin, Ramirez, and Norman 63
House 4/13/2015 4/11/2015 Conference Committee Report Adopted 72
House 4/13/2015 4/11/2015 Third Reading Passed (85-53) 72
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   12-102, 12-103, 12-211, 12-312, 13-601 )
Last Updated: 1/19/2020 9:25 AM