Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Evidence - Testimony by Spouse - Violation of Protective Order
Sponsored by
Delegates Lehman, Acevero, Attar, Atterbeary, B. Barnes, Bartlett, Dumais, W. Fisher, Palakovich Carr, Pena-Melnyk, Stewart, and Valentino-Smith
Status
In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Providing that the spouse of a person on trial for a violation of a protective order may be compelled to testify as an adverse witness if the spouse is the petitioner in the proceeding in which the protective order was issued.
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0241
Introduced in a prior session as: HB1037 Session: 2013 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2019
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/30/2019
Legislative Date
1/30/2019
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Evidence - Testimony by Spouse - Violation of Protective Order
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/01/2019
Legislative Date
2/01/2019
Action
Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/06/2019
Legislative Date
3/06/2019
Action
Withdrawn by Sponsor
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/30/2019 1/30/2019 First Reading Judiciary
Text - First - Evidence - Testimony by Spouse - Violation of Protective Order
House 2/01/2019 2/01/2019 Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/06/2019 3/06/2019 Withdrawn by Sponsor
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM
Click to return on the top page