Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
To Governor
Title
Commission to Study Non-Emergency Medical Transportation Funding
Sponsored by
Delegate Krimm
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing the Commission to Study Non-Emergency Medical Transportation Funding to review the State's funding requirements for non-emergency medical transportation services and the impact on locally operated transit systems; requiring the Commission to consider certain matters as part of the study; providing for the composition, cochairs, and staffing of the Commission; requiring the Commission to report its findings and recommendations to the Governor and to certain committees of the General Assembly by June 30, 2020; etc.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0982
Introduced in a prior session as: HB1537 Session: 2018 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2019
Creates a Task Force or Commission
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/30/2019
Legislative Date
1/30/2019
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Commission to Study Non-Emergency Medical Transportation Funding
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/30/2019
Legislative Date
1/30/2019
Action
Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/11/2019
Legislative Date
3/11/2019
Action
Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/30/2019 1/30/2019 First Reading Health and Government Operations
Text - First - Commission to Study Non-Emergency Medical Transportation Funding
House 1/30/2019 1/30/2019 Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
House 3/11/2019 3/11/2019 Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 1/19/2020 9:23 AM