Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Courts and Judicial Proceedings - Criminal Injuries Compensation Fund - Court Costs
Sponsored by
Delegate Niemann
Status
In the Senate - First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the imposition of specified court costs if a defendant is sentenced to probation before judgment for or pleads nolo contendere to a specified crime or offense.
Committees
Original:
Judiciary  
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0453 Session: 2012 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2013
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/24/2013
Legislative Date
1/25/2013
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/24/2013
Legislative Date
1/24/2013
Action
Hearing 2/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/13/2013
Legislative Date
2/18/2013
Action
Favorable Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/19/2013
Legislative Date
2/19/2013
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
30
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/19/2013
Legislative Date
2/19/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
30
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/21/2013
Legislative Date
2/21/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed (135-0)
Proceedings
32
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/22/2013
Legislative Date
2/22/2013
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
31
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/24/2013 1/25/2013 First Reading Judiciary
House 1/24/2013 1/24/2013 Hearing 2/05 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/13/2013 2/18/2013 Favorable Report by Judiciary
House 2/19/2013 2/19/2013 Favorable Report Adopted 30
House 2/19/2013 2/19/2013 Second Reading Passed 30
House 2/21/2013 2/21/2013 Third Reading Passed (135-0) 32
Senate 2/22/2013 2/22/2013 First Reading Judicial Proceedings 31
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM