Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Admissions and Amusement Tax - Returns and Penalties
Sponsored by
Delegate Niemann
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 4/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Increasing penalties for willful failure to file an admissions and amusement tax return under specified circumstances; increasing penalties for willfully making a false statement or misleading omission on specified admissions and amusement tax returns; increasing penalties for willful failure to keep specified admissions and amusement tax records; etc.
Committees
Original:
Ways and Means  
Opposite:
Budget and Taxation  
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0339 Session: 2012 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2013
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/24/2013
Legislative Date
1/25/2013
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/30/2013
Legislative Date
1/30/2013
Action
Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2013
Legislative Date
3/20/2013
Action
Favorable Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2013
Legislative Date
3/17/2013
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
50
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2013
Legislative Date
3/17/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
50
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/21/2013
Legislative Date
3/18/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed (133-5)
Proceedings
51
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/22/2013
Legislative Date
3/20/2013
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
51
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/27/2013
Legislative Date
3/27/2013
Action
Hearing 4/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/24/2013 1/25/2013 First Reading Ways and Means
House 1/30/2013 1/30/2013 Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/19/2013 3/20/2013 Favorable Report by Ways and Means
House 3/20/2013 3/17/2013 Favorable Report Adopted 50
House 3/20/2013 3/17/2013 Second Reading Passed 50
House 3/21/2013 3/18/2013 Third Reading Passed (133-5) 51
Senate 3/22/2013 3/20/2013 First Reading Budget and Taxation 51
Senate 3/27/2013 3/27/2013 Hearing 4/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   13-1001, 13-1003, 13-1005, 13-1008 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM