Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Redistricting Reform Act of 2017
Sponsored by
The Speaker (By Request - Administration)
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by House Rules and Executive Nominations
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Creating the General Assembly and Congressional Redistricting and Apportionment Commission; requiring the Commission to divide the State to create General Assembly legislative districts and congressional districts, as specified; providing for the membership, qualifications, and duties of the Commission; specifying requirements for the adoption of redistricting plans; requiring the Legislative Auditor to establish and administer an application process for individuals seeking appointment to the Commission; etc.
Committees
Details
Constitutional Bill
Cross-filed with: SB0252
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2017
Bill imposes a mandated appropriation in the annual State Budget Bill
By Request of the Governor
Contingency - on enactment of a constitutional amendment and on a referendum
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/25/2017
Legislative Date
1/25/2017
Action
First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Redistricting Reform Act of 2017
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/01/2017
Legislative Date
2/01/2017
Action
Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2017
Legislative Date
3/20/2017
Action
Unfavorable Report by House Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/25/2017 1/25/2017 First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Text - First - Redistricting Reform Act of 2017
House 2/01/2017 2/01/2017 Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Rules and Executive Nominations
House 3/20/2017 3/20/2017 Unfavorable Report by House Rules and Executive Nominations
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   8-7A-01 through 8-7A-14 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM