Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Tri-County Council for Southern Maryland - Funding
Sponsored by
Charles County Delegation
Status
In the House - Returned Passed
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Increasing, to $125,000, the amount of money that the county commissioners of Calvert County, Charles County, and St. Mary's County are required to appropriate each year for the Tri-County Council for Southern Maryland to foster cooperative planning and development in the region.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0805
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2020
Bill imposes a local government mandate which is a directive in a bill requiring a local government unit to perform a task or assume a responsibility that has a discernible fiscal impact on the local government unit
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/22/2020
Legislative Date
1/22/2020
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Tri-County Council for Southern Maryland - Funding
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/28/2020
Legislative Date
1/28/2020
Action
Hearing 2/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/24/2020
Legislative Date
2/24/2020
Action
Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/25/2020
Legislative Date
2/25/2020
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
35
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Tri-County Council for Southern Maryland - Funding
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/27/2020
Legislative Date
2/27/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (136-0)
Proceedings
37
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/28/2020
Legislative Date
2/28/2020
Action
Referred Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
38
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2020
Legislative Date
3/16/2020
Action
Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2020
Legislative Date
3/12/2020
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
51
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2020
Legislative Date
3/12/2020
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
51
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/12/2020
Action
Motion Rules Suspend Two Readings Same Day Const/Rule 24 (Senator King) Adopted
Proceedings
51A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/12/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (44-0)
Proceedings
51A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/14/2020
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
51
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/22/2020 1/22/2020 First Reading Environment and Transportation
Text - First - Tri-County Council for Southern Maryland - Funding
House 1/28/2020 1/28/2020 Hearing 2/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
House 2/24/2020 2/24/2020 Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation
House 2/25/2020 2/25/2020 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 35
Text - Third - Tri-County Council for Southern Maryland - Funding
House 2/27/2020 2/27/2020 Third Reading Passed (136-0) 37
Senate 2/28/2020 2/28/2020 Referred Budget and Taxation 38
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/16/2020 3/16/2020 Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/16/2020 3/12/2020 Favorable Adopted 51
Senate 3/16/2020 3/12/2020 Second Reading Passed 51
Senate 3/17/2020 3/12/2020 Motion Rules Suspend Two Readings Same Day Const/Rule 24 (Senator King) Adopted 51A
Senate 3/17/2020 3/12/2020 Third Reading Passed (44-0) 51A
House 3/17/2020 3/14/2020 Returned Passed 51
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 3/23/2020 8:57 AM