Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Lead Safe Income Tax Credit
Sponsored by
Delegates Hogan and Beidle
Status
In the House - Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Allowing an individual or a corporation to claim a credit against the State income tax for costs incurred for an approved lead hazard reduction project for qualifying property; providing for the calculation of the credit; providing for the submission of proposals for lead hazard reduction projects to the Department of Housing and Community Development for approval; limiting to $1,000,000 the total amount of credits that the Department may approve for any fiscal year; applying the Act to tax years beginning after December 31, 2012; etc.
Committees
Original:
Ways and Means  
Opposite:
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0554 Session: 2012 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2013
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/24/2013
Legislative Date
1/25/2013
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/25/2013
Legislative Date
1/25/2013
Action
Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/24/2013 1/25/2013 First Reading Ways and Means
House 1/25/2013 1/25/2013 Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
Date Posted Document Name
1/25/2013 Text - First - Lead Safe Income Tax Credit
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   10-733 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM