Bill Search
Bill number does not exist.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
To Governor
Title
More Jobs for Marylanders Act of 2017
Sponsored by
The Speaker (By Request - Administration) and Delegates Adams, Afzali, Anderton, Arentz, Aumann, Beitzel, Buckel, Carozza, Cassilly, Ciliberti, Clark, Cluster, Flanagan, Folden, Ghrist, Grammer, Hornberger, S. Howard, Jacobs, Kipke, Kittleman, Krebs, Long, Malone, Mautz, McComas, McConkey, McKay, Metzgar, Miele, Morgan, Otto, Reilly, Rey, Rose, Shoemaker, Simonaire, Szeliga, Vogt, West, and B. Wilson
Status
In the Senate - Rereferred to Budget and Taxation
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Establishing the More Jobs for Marylanders Program within the Department of Commerce to provide specified manufacturing business entities tax credits and benefits for up to 10 consecutive benefit years; establishing the Workforce Development Sequence Scholarship for specified students enrolled in a public community college in the State; establishing the More Jobs for Marylanders Tax Credit Reserve Fund; authorizing specified manufacturing businesses to claim a refund for the sales and use tax imposed under specified circumstances; etc.
Committees
Original:
Ways and Means  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0317
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2017
By Request of the Governor
History
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/26/2017 1/26/2017 First Reading Ways and Means
Text - First - More Jobs for Marylanders Act of 2017
House 2/07/2017 2/07/2017 Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
House 4/06/2017 4/06/2017 Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
House 4/06/2017 3/30/2017 Favorable with Amendments {865365/1 Adopted 64
House 4/06/2017 3/30/2017 Floor Amendment {593221/1 (Delegate Buckel) Adopted 64
House 4/06/2017 3/30/2017 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 64
Text - Third - More Jobs for Marylanders Act of 2017
House 4/07/2017 3/31/2017 Third Reading Passed (138-0) 65
Senate 4/10/2017 4/02/2017 Referred Rules 62
Senate 4/10/2017 4/10/2017 Rereferred to Budget and Taxation
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   1-101, 6-801 through 6-810 )
(   18-101, 18-3301 through 18-3304 )
(   10-210.1, 10-741, 11-411, 1-303 )
Last Updated: 11/13/2019 12:51 PM