Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Energy Efficiency - Net-Zero Homes - Contract Preferences
Sponsored by
Delegates Rogers, Charkoudian, Bagnall, Boyce, Bridges, Carr, Conaway, Crosby, Crutchfield, Lopez, Love, Queen, Smith, Solomon, Stewart, C. Watson, Wells, and Wilson
Status
In the Senate - Hearing canceled
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the Department of Housing and Community Development to give preference to applications for certain loans that will use the services of certain small, minority, women-owned, and veteran-owned businesses, particularly those businesses that provide employment for individuals trained through workforce development programs, for loans for certain net-zero homes under the Energy-Efficient Homes Construction Loan Program.
Committee Testimony
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2020
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/22/2020
Legislative Date
1/22/2020
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Energy Efficiency - Net-Zero Homes - Contract Preferences
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/28/2020
Legislative Date
1/28/2020
Action
Hearing 2/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/06/2020
Legislative Date
3/06/2020
Action
Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/09/2020
Legislative Date
3/06/2020
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
43A
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Energy Efficiency - Net-Zero Homes - Contract Preferences
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/11/2020
Legislative Date
3/08/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (120-16)
Proceedings
45
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/12/2020
Legislative Date
3/07/2020
Action
Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
46
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/12/2020
Legislative Date
3/12/2020
Action
Hearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2020
Legislative Date
3/15/2020
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/22/2020 1/22/2020 First Reading Environment and Transportation
Text - First - Energy Efficiency - Net-Zero Homes - Contract Preferences
House 1/28/2020 1/28/2020 Hearing 2/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
House 3/06/2020 3/06/2020 Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation
House 3/09/2020 3/06/2020 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 43A
Text - Third - Energy Efficiency - Net-Zero Homes - Contract Preferences
House 3/11/2020 3/08/2020 Third Reading Passed (120-16) 45
Senate 3/12/2020 3/07/2020 Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 46
Senate 3/12/2020 3/12/2020 Hearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/15/2020 3/15/2020 Hearing canceled
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 3/15/2020 7:10 PM