Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Civil Actions – Duty to Render Assistance (First Responder Safety Act)
Sponsored by
Delegate Lisanti
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring an individual to provide reasonable assistance to certain first responders who are under threat of or have incurred serious physical injury if providing such assistance does not endanger self or others; establishing a $250 civil penalty for a violation of the Act; providing civil immunity for a certain individual who renders reasonable assistance to another individual under the Act subject to certain limitations; etc.
Committees
Original:
Judiciary
Committee Testimony
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: HB1053 Session: 2019 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2020
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/22/2020
Legislative Date
1/22/2020
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/22/2020
Legislative Date
1/22/2020
Action
Hearing 2/05 at 2:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/28/2020
Legislative Date
1/28/2020
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/28/2020
Legislative Date
1/28/2020
Action
Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/26/2020
Legislative Date
2/26/2020
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/02/2020
Legislative Date
3/02/2020
Action
Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/22/2020 1/22/2020 First Reading Judiciary
House 1/22/2020 1/22/2020 Hearing 2/05 at 2:00 p.m.
Text - First - Civil Actions – Duty to Render Assistance (First Responder Safety Act)
House 1/28/2020 1/28/2020 Hearing canceled
House 1/28/2020 1/28/2020 Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/26/2020 2/26/2020 Hearing canceled
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
House 3/02/2020 3/02/2020 Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 9/22/2020 1:48 PM