Bill Search
Bill number does not exist.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
To Governor
Title
Community Colleges - Facilities Renewal Grant Program - Established
Sponsored by
Delegates Jones, Brooks, Gaines, Gutierrez, Haynes, Healey, Hettleman, Holmes, Jalisi, Knotts, Lafferty, Morhaim, Mosby, Reznik, Stein, Sydnor, and P. Young
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 687
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Establishing the Community College Facilities Renewal Grant Program to provide State funds to community colleges for improvements, repairs, and deferred maintenance projects; requiring the Maryland Higher Education Commission to administer the Program; requiring the Governor to annually appropriate a certain amount in a certain budget to the Commission; requiring a certain appropriation to be in addition to the appropriation for a certain other program; establishing requirements and limitations in awarding grants; etc.
Committees
Original:
Appropriations  
Opposite:
Budget and Taxation  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0595
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2018
Bill imposes a mandated appropriation in the annual State Budget Bill
History
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/24/2018 1/24/2018 First Reading Appropriations
Text - First - Community Colleges - Facilities Renewal Grant Program - Established
House 1/31/2018 1/31/2018 Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
House 3/12/2018 3/12/2018 Favorable Report by Appropriations
House 3/13/2018 3/10/2018 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 44
Text - Third - Community Colleges - Facilities Renewal Grant Program - Established
House 3/14/2018 3/11/2018 Third Reading Passed (136-0) 45
Senate 3/15/2018 3/15/2018 Referred Budget and Taxation 47
Senate 3/19/2018 3/19/2018 Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/23/2018 3/23/2018 Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/23/2018 3/21/2018 Favorable with Amendments {809237/1 Adopted 52
Senate 3/23/2018 3/21/2018 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 52
Senate 3/26/2018 3/22/2018 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 53
House 3/28/2018 3/21/2018 House Concurs Senate Amendments 55
House 3/28/2018 3/21/2018 Third Reading Passed (137-0) 55
House 3/28/2018 3/21/2018 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Community Colleges - Facilities Renewal Grant Program - Established
Post Passage 5/15/2018 5/15/2018 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 687
Text - Chapter - Community Colleges - Facilities Renewal Grant Program - Established
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   16-320 )
Last Updated: 11/6/2019 4:13 PM