Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Criminal Law - Providing Alcohol to Underage Drinkers - Penalties (Alex and Calvin's Law)
Sponsored by
Delegates Fraser-Hidalgo, Dumais, A. Miller, Anderson, Barkley, Barve, Beidle, Carr, Cullison, Folden, Gilchrist, Gutierrez, Hill, Hixson, Kaiser, Kelly, Korman, Kramer, Lam, Luedtke, McCray, Moon, Morales, Platt, Reznik, S. Robinson, Smith, Valentino-Smith, Waldstreicher, C. Wilson, and Zucker
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 513
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Prohibiting a person from knowingly and willfully allowing an individual under 21 years old to possess or consume an alcoholic beverage at a residence the person owns or leases and in which the person resides or furnishing an alcoholic beverage for consumption to an individual under 21 years old if the adult knew or reasonably should have known the individual would operate a motor vehicle and did operate the vehicle under the influence of alcohol and caused serious injury or death; etc.
Committees
Original:
Judiciary  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0564
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/28/2016
Legislative Date
1/29/2016
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/03/2016
Legislative Date
2/03/2016
Action
Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2016
Legislative Date
3/17/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2016
Legislative Date
3/14/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments {462917/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
46
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2016
Legislative Date
3/14/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
46
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2016
Legislative Date
3/15/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (136-3)
Proceedings
47
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/21/2016
Legislative Date
3/18/2016
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
47A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2016
Legislative Date
4/09/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2016
Legislative Date
4/03/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments {358970/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
63
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2016
Legislative Date
4/03/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
63
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/04/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed with Amendments (45-0)
Proceedings
64
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/07/2016
Action
House Concur - Senate Amendments
Proceedings
70
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/07/2016
Action
Motion Special Order until later today (Delegate O'Donnell) Rejected (45-92)
Proceedings
70
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/07/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (123-15)
Proceedings
70
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/07/2016
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
70
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/19/2016
Legislative Date
5/19/2016
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 513
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/28/2016 1/29/2016 First Reading Judiciary
House 2/03/2016 2/03/2016 Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/16/2016 3/17/2016 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
House 3/17/2016 3/14/2016 Favorable with Amendments {462917/1 Report Adopted 46
House 3/17/2016 3/14/2016 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 46
House 3/17/2016 3/15/2016 Third Reading Passed (136-3) 47
Senate 3/21/2016 3/18/2016 First Reading Judicial Proceedings 47A
Senate 4/08/2016 4/09/2016 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 4/09/2016 4/03/2016 Favorable with Amendments {358970/1 Report Adopted 63
Senate 4/09/2016 4/03/2016 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 63
Senate 4/11/2016 4/04/2016 Third Reading Passed with Amendments (45-0) 64
House 4/11/2016 4/07/2016 House Concur - Senate Amendments 70
House 4/11/2016 4/07/2016 Motion Special Order until later today (Delegate O'Donnell) Rejected (45-92) 70
House 4/11/2016 4/07/2016 Third Reading Passed (123-15) 70
House 4/11/2016 4/07/2016 Passed Enrolled 70
Post Passage 5/19/2016 5/19/2016 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 513
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   10-116, 10-117, 10-121 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM