Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Criminal Procedure - Sexual Assault Evidence Kits - Privacy, Reimbursement, and Notification
Sponsored by
Delegates Bartlett, Atterbeary, Bagnall, Chang, Crutchfield, W. Fisher, Lopez, Shetty, R. Watson, and Williams
Status
In the House - Returned Passed
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring a physician, qualified health care provider, or hospital to provide a certain notice to the Criminal Injuries Compensation Board that services were rendered to a victim of an alleged rape or sexual offense or a victim of alleged child sexual abuse; prohibiting a physician, qualified health care provider, or hospital from including certain information in a request to the Criminal Injuries Compensation Board to obtain payment for services related to certain sexually related crimes under certain circumstances; etc.
Committees
Original:
Judiciary  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0406
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2020
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/23/2020
Legislative Date
1/23/2020
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/24/2020
Legislative Date
1/24/2020
Action
Hearing 2/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/24/2020
Legislative Date
2/24/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/25/2020
Legislative Date
2/25/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments {102811/1 Adopted
Proceedings
35
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/25/2020
Legislative Date
2/25/2020
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
35
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/27/2020
Legislative Date
2/27/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (137-0)
Proceedings
37
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/28/2020
Legislative Date
2/28/2020
Action
Referred Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
38
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2020
Legislative Date
3/14/2020
Action
Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2020
Legislative Date
3/09/2020
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
48
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2020
Legislative Date
3/10/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
49
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2020
Legislative Date
3/12/2020
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
49A
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/23/2020 1/23/2020 First Reading Judiciary
Text - First - Criminal Procedure - Sexual Assault Evidence Kits - Privacy, Reimbursement, and Notification
House 1/24/2020 1/24/2020 Hearing 2/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
House 2/24/2020 2/24/2020 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
House 2/25/2020 2/25/2020 Favorable with Amendments {102811/1 Adopted 35
House 2/25/2020 2/25/2020 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 35
Text - Third - Criminal Procedure - Sexual Assault Evidence Kits - Privacy, Reimbursement, and Notification
House 2/27/2020 2/27/2020 Third Reading Passed (137-0) 37
Senate 2/28/2020 2/28/2020 Referred Judicial Proceedings 38
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/14/2020 3/14/2020 Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/14/2020 3/09/2020 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 48
Senate 3/15/2020 3/10/2020 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 49
House 3/16/2020 3/12/2020 Returned Passed 49A
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 3/23/2020 8:54 AM