Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Public Schools – Student Sunscreen Use – Policy
Sponsored by
Delegates K. Young, Barkley, Barron, Barve, Brooks, Carr, Cullison, Ebersole, Gibson, Gutierrez, Hettleman, Hill, Korman, Krebs, Lisanti, Luedtke, McMillan, Miele, Pendergrass, Proctor, Robinson, Rose, Sample-Hughes, Turner, Vogt, M. Washington, West, and Healey
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 33
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring each county board of education to adopt a certain written policy to authorize a student to possess and use sunscreen on school property or at a school-sponsored activity without written permission from a health care provider; and requiring each county board to encourage public schools to educate students about sunscreen, sun safety, and the policy established under the Act.
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0217
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2018
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/24/2018
Legislative Date
1/24/2018
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Public Schools – Student Sunscreen Use – Policy
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/25/2018
Legislative Date
1/25/2018
Action
Hearing 2/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/19/2018
Legislative Date
2/19/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/20/2018
Legislative Date
2/20/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {465162/1 Adopted
Proceedings
30
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/20/2018
Legislative Date
2/20/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
30
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/22/2018
Legislative Date
2/22/2018
Action
Motion Reconsider Second Reading (Delegate Luedtke) Adopted
Proceedings
32
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/22/2018
Legislative Date
2/22/2018
Action
Floor Amendment {493722/1 (Delegate Healey) Adopted
Proceedings
32
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/22/2018
Legislative Date
2/22/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
32
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Public Schools – Student Sunscreen Use – Policy
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/27/2018
Legislative Date
2/27/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (135-0)
Proceedings
35
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/28/2018
Legislative Date
2/28/2018
Action
Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
36
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/30/2018
Legislative Date
3/30/2018
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/30/2018
Legislative Date
3/27/2018
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
58
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2018
Legislative Date
3/28/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
59
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2018
Legislative Date
3/25/2018
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
59
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/10/2018
Legislative Date
4/10/2018
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 33
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Public Schools – Student Sunscreen Use – Policy
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/24/2018 1/24/2018 First Reading Ways and Means
Text - First - Public Schools – Student Sunscreen Use – Policy
House 1/25/2018 1/25/2018 Hearing 2/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
House 2/19/2018 2/19/2018 Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
House 2/20/2018 2/20/2018 Favorable with Amendments {465162/1 Adopted 30
House 2/20/2018 2/20/2018 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 30
House 2/22/2018 2/22/2018 Motion Reconsider Second Reading (Delegate Luedtke) Adopted 32
House 2/22/2018 2/22/2018 Floor Amendment {493722/1 (Delegate Healey) Adopted 32
House 2/22/2018 2/22/2018 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 32
Text - Third - Public Schools – Student Sunscreen Use – Policy
House 2/27/2018 2/27/2018 Third Reading Passed (135-0) 35
Senate 2/28/2018 2/28/2018 Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 36
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/30/2018 3/30/2018 Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/30/2018 3/27/2018 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 58
Senate 4/02/2018 3/28/2018 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 59
House 4/03/2018 3/25/2018 Returned Passed 59
Post Passage 4/10/2018 4/10/2018 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 33
Text - Chapter - Public Schools – Student Sunscreen Use – Policy
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   7-441 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM