Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Education - Student Data Privacy Council
Sponsored by
Delegates Kaiser, Afzali, Buckel, Carey, Chang, Ebersole, Fennell, Haynes, Jalisi, Kramer, Lam, McComas, McCray, McIntosh, Morales, Morhaim, Smith, Turner, West, and Zucker
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 3/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing the Student Data Privacy Council; providing for the 21 members, the chair, and the staffing of the Council; prohibiting a member of the Council from receiving specified compensation, but authorizing the reimbursement of specified expenses; requiring the Council to study and make recommendations regarding the development and implementation of the Student Data Privacy Act of 2015; requiring the Council to report its findings to the Governor and the General Assembly on or before December 31, 2017.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2016
Creates a Task Force or Commission
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/28/2016
Legislative Date
1/29/2016
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/03/2016
Legislative Date
2/03/2016
Action
Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/26/2016
Legislative Date
2/29/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/01/2016
Legislative Date
3/01/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments {165260/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
35
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/01/2016
Legislative Date
3/01/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
35
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/03/2016
Legislative Date
3/03/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (139-0)
Proceedings
37
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/04/2016
Legislative Date
3/04/2016
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
37
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/07/2016
Legislative Date
3/07/2016
Action
Hearing 3/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/28/2016 1/29/2016 First Reading Ways and Means
House 2/03/2016 2/03/2016 Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/26/2016 2/29/2016 Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
House 3/01/2016 3/01/2016 Favorable with Amendments {165260/1 Report Adopted 35
House 3/01/2016 3/01/2016 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 35
House 3/03/2016 3/03/2016 Third Reading Passed (139-0) 37
Senate 3/04/2016 3/04/2016 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 37
Senate 3/07/2016 3/07/2016 Hearing 3/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM