Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Department of Health and Mental Hygiene - Prescription Drug Monitoring Program - Modifications
Sponsored by
Delegates Barron, Hammen, Jackson, Lisanti, Sample-Hughes, K. Young, Angel, Bromwell, Hayes, Kelly, Kipke, Krebs, McDonough, McMillan, Miele, Morgan, Oaks, Pena-Melnyk, Pendergrass, Rose, Saab, and West
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 147
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Attorney General's Review Letter
Synopsis
Requiring that specified authorized providers be registered with the Prescription Drug Monitoring Program before obtaining a new or renewal controlled dangerous substance registration; requiring that specified prescribers be registered with the Program before obtaining a new or renewal registration or by July 1, 2017, whichever is sooner; authorizing the Secretary of Health and Mental Hygiene to identify and publish a list of monitored prescription drugs that have low potential for abuse; etc.
Committees
Opposite:
Finance  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0537
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2016
Contingency - on a contingency described in Sec. 8 and 9 of the bill
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/28/2016
Legislative Date
1/29/2016
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/04/2016
Legislative Date
2/04/2016
Action
Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/25/2016
Legislative Date
3/28/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/29/2016
Legislative Date
3/24/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments {286687/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
56
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/29/2016
Legislative Date
3/24/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
56
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/30/2016
Legislative Date
3/25/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (136-2)
Proceedings
57
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/31/2016
Legislative Date
3/27/2016
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
56
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2016
Legislative Date
4/06/2016
Action
Rereferred to Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2016
Legislative Date
4/06/2016
Action
Hearing 4/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2016
Legislative Date
4/08/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2016
Legislative Date
4/02/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments {877079/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2016
Legislative Date
4/02/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/03/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed with Amendments (46-0)
Proceedings
63A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/06/2016
Action
House Concur - Senate Amendments
Proceedings
69
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/06/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (136-3)
Proceedings
69
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/06/2016
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
69
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/26/2016
Legislative Date
4/26/2016
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 147
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/28/2016 1/29/2016 First Reading Health and Government Operations
House 2/04/2016 2/04/2016 Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/25/2016 3/28/2016 Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
House 3/29/2016 3/24/2016 Favorable with Amendments {286687/1 Report Adopted 56
House 3/29/2016 3/24/2016 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 56
House 3/30/2016 3/25/2016 Third Reading Passed (136-2) 57
Senate 3/31/2016 3/27/2016 First Reading Senate Rules 56
Senate 4/05/2016 4/06/2016 Rereferred to Finance
Senate 4/06/2016 4/06/2016 Hearing 4/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 4/07/2016 4/08/2016 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 4/08/2016 4/02/2016 Favorable with Amendments {877079/1 Report Adopted 62
Senate 4/08/2016 4/02/2016 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 62
Senate 4/11/2016 4/03/2016 Third Reading Passed with Amendments (46-0) 63A
House 4/11/2016 4/06/2016 House Concur - Senate Amendments 69
House 4/11/2016 4/06/2016 Third Reading Passed (136-3) 69
House 4/11/2016 4/06/2016 Passed Enrolled 69
Post Passage 4/26/2016 4/26/2016 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 147
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   5-304 )
(   21-2A-01, 21-2A-02, 21-2A-03, 21-2A-04, 21-2A-04.1, 21-2A-04.2, 21-2A-04.3, 21-2A-05, 21-2A-06, 21-2A-07, 21-2A-08, 21-2A-09 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM