Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Campaign Finance Reports - Business Contributors - Registration Status
Sponsored by
Delegate Mosby
Status
In the Senate - First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the State Department of Assessments and Taxation to electronically transmit certain lists of registered and forfeited businesses to the State Board of Elections by January 15 each year; requiring the Department to electronically transmit the name of a business seeking reinstatement of its registration to the Board within 24 hours of processing the filing; requiring the State Board to use certain information transmitted by the Department to identify and compile contributions made by certain businesses; etc.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): January 1, 2021
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/23/2020
Legislative Date
1/23/2020
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/23/2020
Legislative Date
1/23/2020
Action
Hearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Campaign Finance Reports - Business Contributors - Registration Status
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/09/2020
Legislative Date
3/09/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/10/2020
Legislative Date
3/07/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments {785364/1 Adopted
Proceedings
44
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/10/2020
Legislative Date
3/07/2020
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
44
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Campaign Finance Reports - Business Contributors - Registration Status
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/11/2020
Legislative Date
3/08/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (95-42)
Proceedings
45
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/12/2020
Legislative Date
3/07/2020
Action
Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
46
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/23/2020 1/23/2020 First Reading Ways and Means
House 1/23/2020 1/23/2020 Hearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Campaign Finance Reports - Business Contributors - Registration Status
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
House 3/09/2020 3/09/2020 Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
House 3/10/2020 3/07/2020 Favorable with Amendments {785364/1 Adopted 44
House 3/10/2020 3/07/2020 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 44
Text - Third - Campaign Finance Reports - Business Contributors - Registration Status
House 3/11/2020 3/08/2020 Third Reading Passed (95-42) 45
Senate 3/12/2020 3/07/2020 Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 46
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 3/16/2020 10:39 AM