Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Renewable Energy Portfolio Standard - Eligible Sources
Sponsored by
Delegates Mosby, Bartlett, Cardin, Carr, Charkoudian, Feldmark, W. Fisher, Fraser-Hidalgo, Hettleman, Hill, Kerr, Lehman, R. Lewis, Lierman, Shetty, Smith, Terrasa, Turner, and K. Young
Status
In the House - Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering the eligibility of certain sources of energy for the creation of credits under the renewable energy portfolio standard; removing certain sources from the definition of a "Tier 1 renewable source"; providing that existing obligations or contract rights may not be impaired by the Act; and applying the Act to all renewable energy portfolio standard compliance years beginning after December 31, 2020.
Committees
Original:
Economic Matters  
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0560
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0961 Session: 2019 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2020
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/23/2020
Legislative Date
1/23/2020
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Renewable Energy Portfolio Standard - Eligible Sources
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/24/2020
Legislative Date
1/24/2020
Action
Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/23/2020 1/23/2020 First Reading Economic Matters
Text - First - Renewable Energy Portfolio Standard - Eligible Sources
House 1/24/2020 1/24/2020 Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   7-701, 7-704 )
Last Updated: 9/22/2020 1:50 PM