Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Income Tax - Subtraction Modification - Retirement Income
Sponsored by
Delegates Tarrant, Conaway, Hogan, Morhaim, Proctor, Stukes, and F. Turner
Status
In the House - Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Increasing the maximum amount allowed as a subtraction modification under the State income tax for specified retirement income of an individual who is at least 70 years old or who is totally disabled; reducing the maximum amount of retirement income allowed as a subtraction modification by the amount of Social Security benefits received; providing that the amount of the subtraction modification may not exceed specified amounts during specified taxable years; applying the Act to taxable years after December 31, 2012; etc.
Committees
Original:
Ways and Means  
Opposite:
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0048
Introduced in a prior session as: SB0752 Session: 2012 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2013
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/28/2013
Legislative Date
1/28/2013
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/30/2013
Legislative Date
1/30/2013
Action
Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/28/2013 1/28/2013 First Reading Ways and Means
House 1/30/2013 1/30/2013 Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   10-209 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM