Bill Search
Bill number does not exist.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
To Governor
Title
Agriculture - Industrial Hemp - Agricultural or Academic Research
Sponsored by
Delegates Fraser-Hidalgo, Beidle, Lam, and Morhaim
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 105
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Authorizing the Department of Agriculture or an institution of higher education to grow or cultivate industrial hemp if the industrial hemp is grown or cultivated for agricultural research or academic research purposes; requiring a site used by the Department or an institution of higher education to grow or cultivate industrial hemp to be certified by and registered with the Department; authorizing the Department to adopt specified regulations; etc.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2016
History
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/28/2016 1/29/2016 First Reading Environment and Transportation
House 1/29/2016 1/29/2016 Hearing 2/10 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/03/2016 3/07/2016 Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
House 3/08/2016 3/08/2016 Favorable with Amendments {880814/1 Report Adopted 40
House 3/08/2016 3/08/2016 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 40
House 3/11/2016 3/11/2016 Third Reading Passed (136-0) 43
Senate 3/14/2016 3/14/2016 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 43
Senate 3/16/2016 3/16/2016 Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/25/2016 3/29/2016 Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/29/2016 3/25/2016 Favorable Report Adopted 54
Senate 3/29/2016 3/25/2016 Second Reading Passed 54
Senate 3/30/2016 3/26/2016 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 55
House 3/31/2016 3/26/2016 Returned Passed 58
Post Passage 4/12/2016 4/12/2016 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 105
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   14-101, 14-102 )
Last Updated: 11/6/2019 4:12 PM