Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Relief From Budget Mandates
Sponsored by
The Speaker (By Request - Administration) and Delegates Adams, Afzali, Arentz, Aumann, Beitzel, Buckel, Carozza, Cassilly, Ciliberti, Cluster, Fisher, Flanagan, Folden, Ghrist, Glass, Grammer, Hornberger, S. Howard, Impallaria, Jacobs, Kipke, Kittleman, Krebs, Long, Malone, Mautz, McComas, McConkey, McDonough, McKay, McMillan, Metzgar, Miele, Morgan, O'Donnell, Otto, Parrott, Reilly, Rey, Rose, Saab, Shoemaker, Simonaire, Szeliga, Vogt, West, B. Wilson, and Wivell
Status
In the House - Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Providing that if a specified revenue estimate does not exceed a prior estimate the Governor is not required to include an appropriation in the budget for a program or item in an amount that exceeds the fiscal year 2018 appropriation for the program or item; requiring the Governor to fund specified mandated appropriations; prohibiting the General Assembly from enacting legislation that creates a new required level of funding in the annual budget bill for a specific program or item unless specified provisions are included; etc.
Committees
Original:
Appropriations  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0375
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2016
By Request of the Governor
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/28/2016
Legislative Date
1/29/2016
Action
First Reading Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/03/2016
Legislative Date
2/03/2016
Action
Hearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2016
Legislative Date
2/12/2016
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/17/2016
Legislative Date
2/17/2016
Action
Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/28/2016 1/29/2016 First Reading Appropriations
House 2/03/2016 2/03/2016 Hearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/12/2016 2/12/2016 Hearing cancelled
House 2/17/2016 2/17/2016 Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
Date Posted Document Name
1/29/2016 Text - First - Relief From Budget Mandates
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM