Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Environment – Sale or Transfer of Home With On–Site Sewage Disposal System – Nitrogen Removal Technology Requirement
Sponsored by
Delegate Lafferty
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring a homeowner of a certain home located in the State in the Chesapeake and Atlantic Coastal Bays Critical Area to ensure the home's on-site sewage disposal system utilizes or will be upgraded to utilize nitrogen removal technology before the home is sold or transferred.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2018
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/25/2018
Legislative Date
1/25/2018
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/30/2018
Legislative Date
1/30/2018
Action
Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/06/2018
Legislative Date
2/06/2018
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/06/2018
Legislative Date
2/06/2018
Action
Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2018
Legislative Date
3/16/2018
Action
Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/25/2018 1/25/2018 First Reading Environment and Transportation
Text - First - Environment – Sale or Transfer of Home With On–Site Sewage Disposal System – Nitrogen Removal Technology Requirement
House 1/30/2018 1/30/2018 Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/06/2018 2/06/2018 Hearing canceled
House 2/06/2018 2/06/2018 Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
House 3/16/2018 3/16/2018 Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   9-1108 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM